EP2193194 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2-METHYL-1,2-DIHYDROXYPROPANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmholtz-Zentrum für Umweltforschung GmbH - UFZ Permoserstrasse 15 04318 Leipzig / DE | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Roland H. Grassdorfer Str. 69a 04425 Taucha / DE | 02 /
BREUER, Uta Ahornweg 17 04435 Schkeuditz / DE | 03 /
VON BERGEN, Martin Thomasiusstrasse 20 04109 Leipzig / DE | 04 /
BENNDORF, Dirk An der Märchenwiese 12 04277 Leipzig / DE | 05 /
ROHWERDER, Thore Günzstrasse 22 04299 Leipzig / DE | 06 /
SCHÄFER, Franziska Goldlackstr. 5 04416 Markkleeberg / DE | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/23] | 01 /
MÜLLER, Roland H. Grassdorfer Str. 69a 04425 Taucha / DE | ||
02 /
BREUER, Uta Ahornweg 17 04435 Schkeuditz / DE | |||
03 /
VON BERGEN, Martin Paul-Heyse-Str. 24 04337 Leipzig / DE | |||
04 /
BENNDORF, Dirk Steinstr. 85 04275 Leipzig / DE | |||
05 /
ROHWERDER, Thore Zwischen den Gärten 9 45422 Mühlheim/ruhr / DE | |||
06 /
SCHÄFER, Franziska Goldlackstr. 5 04416 Markkleeberg / DE | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/23] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 D-10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08804178.5 | 15.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008EP62217 | Priority number, date | DE20071045093 | 17.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007045093 | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009037217 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2193194 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193194 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/02, C12P7/18 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP);
C12N9/0071 (EP);
C12N9/0073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-METHYL-1,2-DIHYDROXYPROPAN | [2010/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2-METHYL-1,2-DIHYDROXYPROPANE | [2010/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 2-MÉTHYL-1,2-DIHYDROXYPROPANE | [2010/23] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 11.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HR | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | IE | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | MT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | NO | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | LU | 15.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 15.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HR | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NO | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 30.03.2011 | |
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2888580 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-23 * figure 1; sequences 1-10 *; | [A] - FERREIRA N L ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of a new Mycobacterium austroafricanum strain, IFP 2015, growing on MTBE", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20050719), vol. 70, no. 3, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 358 - 365, XP002380213 [A] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * page 360, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST; figure 2a * | [A] - ROHWERDER THORE ET AL, "The alkyl tert-butyl ether intermediate 2-hydroxyisobutyrate is degraded via a novel cobalamin-dependent mutase pathway", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20060601), vol. 72, no. 6, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 4128 - 4135, XP002460829 [A] 1-23 * page 4128, column RIGHT, lines 17-19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.00080-06 | [A] - NICOLAS LOPES FERREIRA ET AL, "Enzymes and genes involved in the aerobic biodegradation of methyl tert-butyl ether (MTBE)", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060628), vol. 72, no. 2, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 252 - 262, XP019422076 [A] 1-23 * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-006-0494-3 | [A] - KANE STACI R ET AL, "Whole-genome analysis of the methyl tert-butyl ether-degrading beta-proteobacterium Methylibium petroleiphilum PM1", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200703), vol. 189, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1931 - 1945, XP002508607 [A] 1-23 * pages 1941-43 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.01259-06 | [A] - "putative iron sulfur oxidoreductase", UniProt, (20070306), Database accession no. A2SP35, URL: EBI, XP002508610 [A] 1-4 * 99.7% similarity with Seq ID 2; column A * | [A] - "Phtalate 4,5 dioxygenase", UniProt, (20070306), Database accession no. A2SP36, URL: EBI, XP002508611 [A] 1-3 * 99.8% similarity with Seq ID 1; column A * | [PX] - SCHAEFER F ET AL, "Growth of Aquincola tertiaricarbonis L108 on tert-butyl alcohol leads to the induction of a phthalate dioxygenase-related protein and its associated oxidoreductase subunit", ENGINEERING IN LIFE SCIENCES, (200710), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 1618-0240, pages 512 - 519, XP002508608 [PX] 1-23 * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elsc.200700011 | [PX] - HRISTOVA KRASSIMIRA R ET AL, "Comparative transcriptome analysis of Methylibium petroleiphilum PM1 exposed to the fuel oxygenates methyl tert-butyl ether and ethanol", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200711), vol. 73, no. 22, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 7347 - 7357, XP002508609 [PX] 1-23 * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.01604-07 |