Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2328750
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.05.2013 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
11.01.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2011 |
First examination report |
|
18.11.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.05.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
06.05.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
19.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|