EP2197819 - USE OF A MIXTURE OF AN ORDERED INTERMETALLIC COMPOUND AND AN INERT MATERIAL AS A CATALYST AND CORRESPONDING HYDROGENATION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states MPG Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMBRÜSTER, Marc Bamberger Strasse 43 01187 Dresden / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Marcus Thulestrasse 34a 13189 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KOVNIR, Kirill 3909 Reserve Dr. Apt. 226 Tallahassee, FL 32311 / US | 04 /
FRIEDRICH, Matthias Trebrastrasse 6 09496 Marienberg / DE | 05 /
WEINHOLD, Karina Hauptstrasse 98 09600 Weissenborn-Berthelsdorf / DE | 06 /
GRIN, Juri Ludwig-Hartmann-Strasse 5 01277 Dresden / DE | 07 /
SCHLÖGL, Robert Martin-Luther-Strasse 45 10779 Berlin / DE | [2010/29] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
ARMBRÜSTER, Marc Bamberger Strasse 43 01187 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
SCHMIDT, Marcus Thulestrasse 34a 13189 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
KOVNIR, Kirill Klingenberger Strasse 12 01187 Dresden / DE | |||
04 /
FRIEDRICH, Matthias Trebrastrasse 6 09496 Marienberg / DE | |||
05 /
WEINHOLD, Karina Hauptstrasse 98 09600 Weissenborn-Berthelsdorf / DE | |||
06 /
GRIN, Juri Ludwig-Hartmann-Strasse 5 01277 Dresden / DE | |||
07 /
SCHLÖGL, Robert Martin-Luther-Strasse 45 10779 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08804365.8 | 18.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008EP62424 | Priority number, date | EP20070018368 | 19.09.2007 Original published format: EP 07018368 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009037301 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2197819 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197819 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C7/163, C07C7/167, C07C5/05 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
C07C5/05 (EP,US);
C07C5/02 (US);
C07C5/09 (US);
C07C7/163 (EP,US);
C07C7/167 (EP,US);
C07C2523/62 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | C07C5/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER MISCHUNG EINER GEORDNETEN INTERMETALLISCHEN VERBINDUNG UND EINES INERTEN MATERIALS ALS KATALYSATOR, UND ENTSPRECHENDE HYDRIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/25] | English: | USE OF A MIXTURE OF AN ORDERED INTERMETALLIC COMPOUND AND AN INERT MATERIAL AS A CATALYST AND CORRESPONDING HYDROGENATION PROCESSES | [2010/25] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN MÉLANGE DE COMPOSÉ INTERMÉTALLIQUE ORDONNÉ ET D'UN MATÉRIAU INERTE EN TANT QUE CATALYSEUR ET PROCÉDÉS D'HYDROGÉNATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2008 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | HR | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | MT | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | IE | 18.09.2013 | LU | 18.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | NO | 14.11.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 14.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP1834939 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [PX] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X] - SALES E A ET AL, "Palladium, Palladium-Tin, and Palladium-Silver Catalysts in the Selective Hydrogenation of Hexadienes: TPR, Mossbauer, and Infrared Studies of Adsorbed CO", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (20001001), vol. 195, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 88 - 95, XP004437965 [X] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcat.2000.2967 | [A] - SALES E A ET AL, "Liquid-Phase Selective Hydrogenation of Hexa-1,5-diene and Hexa-1,3-diene on Palladium Catalysts. Effect of Tin and Silver Addition", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (20001001), vol. 195, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 96 - 105, XP004437966 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcat.2000.2966 | [A] - COQ ET AL, "Bimetallic palladium catalysts: influence of the co-metal on the catalyst performance", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. A, CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2001), vol. 173, ISSN 1381-1169, pages 117 - 134, XP002396823 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-1169(01)00148-0 | [A] - CAO ET AL, "Supported platinum-gallium catalysts for selective hydrodechlorination of CCl4", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. A, CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20051201), vol. 242, no. 1-2, ISSN 1381-1169, pages 119 - 128, XP005162919 [A] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2005.08.006 |