EP2200602 - CONTROLLED RELEASE TAMSULOSIN HYDROCHLORIDE TABLETS AND A PROCESS OF MAKING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Lek Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERC, Janez Trebinjska 7 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 02 /
HOMAR, Miha Ob potoku 8 2310 Slovenska Bistrica / SI | 03 /
JURKOVIC, Polona Planinska c. 14 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08804714.7 | 25.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP62815 | Priority number, date | EP20070117285 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: EP 07117285 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009040388 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2200602 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/18, A61K9/14, A61P13/08, A61P13/10 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K31/18 (EP,US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2853 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | TAMSULOSIN-HYDROCHLORID-TABLETTEN MIT KONTROLLIERTER FREISETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/26] | English: | CONTROLLED RELEASE TAMSULOSIN HYDROCHLORIDE TABLETS AND A PROCESS OF MAKING THEM | [2010/26] | French: | COMPRIMÉS DE CHLORHYDRATE DE TAMSULOSINE À LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 04.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 12.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE202004003404U (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-10 * page 7 - page 14; examples 1-10; table 1 *; | [DX]EP1568361 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-10 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0121]; examples B-step,2-4 *; | [DAY]EP1595538 (SYNTHON BV [NL]) [DA] 1-8,10 * the whole document * [Y] 9; | [Y]WO03022252 (INTELLIPHARMACEUTICS CORP [CA], et al) [Y] 9 * examples 1-8 *; | [A]WO03039531 (SYNTHON BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - CHAPPLE ET AL, "The Development of the Oral Controlled Absorption System (OCAS<(>R)): A New Improved Formulation of Tamsulosin", EUROPEAN UROLOGY SUPPLEMENTS, XX, XX, (200510), vol. 4, no. 7, ISSN 1569-9056, pages 1 - 4, XP005029724 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eursup.2005.07.001 |