EP2193090 - SORTING SYSTEM FOR SORTING BULK GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRECH, Dietmar Menzelstrasse 10 67659 Kaiserslautern / DE | 02 /
TANZ, Torsten Staufenstr. 15 78247 Hilzingen / DE | [2010/23] | Application number, filing date | 08804942.4 | 01.10.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008EP63117 | Priority number, date | DE20071047000 | 01.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007047000 | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009047177 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2193090 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/96, B65G54/02, B60L13/10 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B65G47/96 (EP,US);
B60L13/10 (EP,US);
B65G17/345 (EP,US);
B65G54/02 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SORTIERSYSTEM ZUR STÜCKGUTSORTIERUNG | [2010/23] | English: | SORTING SYSTEM FOR SORTING BULK GOODS | [2010/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRI POUR MARCHANDISES DE DÉTAIL | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 29.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2010/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0654403 (DAIFUKU KK) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * [Y] 3; | [Y]US2004226475 (CHEN GA-LANE [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5467718 (SHIBATA SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document *; | [X]NL7415619 (HANS ADOLF BAKKEREN) [X] 1 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 20; figure . *; | [A]JPS61224808 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE10247909 (ELEK SCHE AUTOMATISIERUNGS UND [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007]; figure - *; | [A]EP1177147 (COOPER POWER TOOLS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010]; figure - * |