EP2276568 - WATER TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valtancoli, Natalberto 648 route de la Cima 06790 Aspremont / FR | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Bonneau, Gérard 561 Chemin de Roubion 06600 Antibes / FR | [2011/04] | Application number, filing date | 08805527.2 | 30.04.2008 | [2011/04] | WO2008FR00614 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133251 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276568 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J49/00, C02F1/42, F16K1/16 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
C02F1/42 (EP);
B01J49/85 (EP);
C02F2209/005 (EP);
C02F2303/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | WASSERBEHANDLUNGS VORRICHTUNG | [2011/04] | English: | WATER TREATMENT DEVICE | [2011/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 30.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 05.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.10.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9804349 (PADEMA NAAMLOZE VENNOOTSCHAP [BE]; MOORTELE GUIDO IVO CESAR MARIA [BE]) [DX] 1-29 * page 20, line 23 - line 28 * * page 38 - page 40 * * page 44 - page 57 * * figures 2,34,47,51-54 *; | [A]US4919314 (NISHIYAMA MASANOBU [JP] ET AL) [A] 10 * column 9, lines 9-68 * * figures 15,16 *; | [A]EP0941968 (CHEMICAL ENGINEERING CORP [US] 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 11 * paragraphs [0047] , [0055] , [0072] * * figures 17,18,29,30,39,41 * |