EP2162407 - ADDITIVE FOR REDUCING HEXAVALENT CHROMIUM, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND APPLICATIONS OF SAID ADDITIVE PARTICULARLY IN CEMENT-BASED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lang, Gérard 85 avenue du Général Leclerc 54220 Malzeville / FR | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Brungard, Yves Francois Novagraaf Technologies 11 rue Graham Bell 57070 Metz / FR | Application number, filing date | 08805983.7 | 12.06.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008FR51048 | Priority number, date | FR20070004153 | 12.06.2007 Original published format: FR 0704153 | [2010/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009004219 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2162407 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B22/14, C04B40/00 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
C04B40/0039 (EP);
C04B22/149 (EP);
C04B2103/52 (EP);
C04B2111/1081 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B40/0039, C04B22/08, C04B2103/0096, C04B2103/608 (EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B22/149, C04B24/04, C04B24/12, C04B24/122 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | ZUSATZ ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON HEXAVALENTEM CHROM, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN GEWINNUNG UND ANWENDUNGEN DIESES ZUSATZES INSBESONDERE IN PRODUKTEN AUF ZEMENTBASIS | [2010/11] | English: | ADDITIVE FOR REDUCING HEXAVALENT CHROMIUM, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND APPLICATIONS OF SAID ADDITIVE PARTICULARLY IN CEMENT-BASED PRODUCTS | [2010/11] | French: | ADDITIF DE RÉDUCTION DU CHROME HEXAVALENT, SON PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION, ET APPLICATIONS DE CET ADDITIF NOTAMMENT DANS LES PRODUITS À BASE DE CIMENTS. | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1505045 (PAUL LOHMANN GMBH KG DR [DE]) [X] 9-14 * example 2 * * claim 8 *; | [A]WO2005037728 (GRACE W R & CO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1533287 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2005076858 (GRACE W R & CO [US], et al) [X] 9-14 * page 1, line 26 - page 14, line 28 * * example 3 * [I] 1-8; | [A]EP1661871 (MAPEI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * example 2 ** claim 10 * |