EP2171713 - CODING OF DIGITAL AUDIO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states France Télécom 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVESI, Balazs 16 chemin du Moulin à Vent F-22300 Lannion / FR | 02 /
LE GUYADER, Alain 12 rue de Crec'h Huet F-22300 Lannion / FR | 03 /
RAGOT, Stéphane Allegoat (Servel) F-22300 Lannion / FR | [2010/14] | Application number, filing date | 08805994.4 | 13.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008FR51059 | Priority number, date | WO2007FR557792 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: PCT/FR2007/557792 | [2010/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009004227 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171713 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2171713 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H04B14/04 (EP,BR,US);
G10L19/032 (EP,BR,US);
G10L19/265 (EP,BR,US);
G10L19/24 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | KODIERUNG DIGITALER AUDIOSIGNALE | [2010/14] | English: | CODING OF DIGITAL AUDIO SIGNALS | [2010/14] | French: | CODAGE DE SIGNAUX AUDIONUMÉRIQUES | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HR | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IE | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | MT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | LU | 13.06.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | NO | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
LU | 13.06.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 16.03.2011 | |
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0331405 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * figure 5 * * page 4, line 32 - line 36 * * page 5, line 31 - line 33 * * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 19 *; | [X]EP0466190 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 20 - line 32 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 42 *; | [X]EP0632597 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 7, line 3 - line 57; figures 2,4 *; | [DA] - JUIN-HWEY CHEN, "Novel Codec Structures for Noise Feedback Coding of Speech", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2006. ICASSP 2006 PROCEEDINGS. 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOULOUSE, FRANCE 14-19 MAY 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060514), ISBN 1-4244-0469-X, pages I - 681, XP010930271 [DA] 4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2006.1660112 |