EP2214728 - WOUND DRESSING WITH APERTURED COVER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Systagenix Wound Management IP Co. BV. Keizersgracht 64 1015 CS Amsterdam / NL | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Rachael, Louise 49 Castle Street Skipton BD23 2DH / GB | 02 /
STEDMAN, Margaret 24 St. Andrews Walk Harrogate North Yorkshire HG2 7RL / GB | 03 /
STEPHENS, Sally 3 Hurrs Road Skipton BD23 2JX / GB | 04 /
BAYLIFF, Simon 8 Cross Bank Skipton North Yorkshire BD23 6AH / GB | [2012/26] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
CLARK, Rachael, Louise 49 Castle Street Skipton BD23 2DH / GB | ||
02 /
STEDMAN, Margaret 24 St. Andrews Walk Harrogate North Yorkshire HG2 7RL / GB | |||
03 /
STEPHENS, Sally 3 Hurrs Road Skipton BD23 2JX / GB | |||
04 /
BAYLIFF, Simon 8 Cross Bank Skipton North Yorkshire BD23 6AH / GB | Representative(s) | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2010/32] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08806234.4 | 10.09.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008GB03075 | Priority number, date | GB20070017698 | 11.09.2007 Original published format: GB 0717698 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009034322 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2214728 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2214728 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/18, A61L15/60, A61L15/46, A61L15/42, A61F13/02 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61F13/00 (GB);
A61F13/0203 (EP,US);
A61L15/18 (EP,US);
A61L15/425 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | A61L15/18, A61L15/60, A61L15/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | WUNDVERBAND MIT ABDECKTEIL MIT ÖFFNUNGEN | [2010/32] | English: | WOUND DRESSING WITH APERTURED COVER SHEET | [2010/32] | French: | PANSEMENT MUNI D'UNE FEUILLE DE COUVERTURE QUI COMPORTE DES OUVERTURES | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 16.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | HR | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 10.09.2012 | FI | 10.09.2012 | IE | 10.09.2012 | LU | 10.09.2012 | HU | 11.09.2012 | SE | 11.09.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | NO | 30.09.2012 | DK | 01.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2012 | ||
FI | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.09.2012 | ||
HU | 11.09.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 30.09.2012 | ||
DK | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2012 | ||
FI | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.09.2012 | ||
HU | 11.09.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 30.09.2012 | ||
DK | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2012 | ||
FI | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.09.2012 | ||
HU | 11.09.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 30.09.2012 | ||
DK | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/39] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2012 | ||
FI | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.09.2012 | ||
HU | 11.09.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2012 | ||
FI | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.09.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2012 | ||
FI | 10.09.2012 | ||
IE | 10.09.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2012 | ||
FI | 10.09.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 11.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0097517 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS [GB]); | [A]US4715857 (JUHASZ LASZLO [GB], et al); | [YD]WO0243743 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al); | [Y]WO02062403 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al); | [X]WO03045294 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al); | [YD]WO03053484 (NOBLE FIBER TECHNOLOGIES [US]); | [X]GB2392836 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB]); | [YD]WO2004024197 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al); | [X]GB2393655 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB]); | [XY]WO2004112852 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al); | [Y]US2005054998 (POCCIA JOHN F [US], et al) |