EP2188278 - PHTHALAZINONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAVAID, Muhammad, Hashim Kudos Pharmceuticals Limited 410 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0PE / GB | 02 /
MENEAR, Keith, Allan Kudos Pharmaceuticals Limited 410 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0PE / GB | 03 /
MARTIN, Niall, Morrison, Barr Kudos Pharmceuticals Limited 410 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0PE / GB | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08806239.3 | 12.09.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008GB03080 | Priority number, date | US20070972384P | 14.09.2007 Original published format: US 972384 P | US20080032642 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 32642 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009034326 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188278 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/10, A61K31/502, A61P35/00 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
C07D403/10 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | PHTHALAZINONDERIVATE | [2010/21] | English: | PHTHALAZINONE DERIVATIVES | [2010/21] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PHTALAZINONE | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 19.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO2007045877 (KUDOS PHARM LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [PY]EP1908481 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [PY] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2006137510 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22; | [E]US2008269234 (GANDHI VIRAJKUMAR B [US], et al) [E] 1-22 * paragraphs [1125] , [1126] * |