EP2206102 - DYNAMIC ADAPTATION OF THE POWER SUPPLY VOLTAGE FOR CURRENT-DRIVEN EL DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Building 2020 Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire CB23 6DW / GB | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Euan 10 Rampton Drift Longstanton Cambridgeshire CB24 2EH / GB | 02 /
PAGE, Richard 932 Trophy Drive Mountain View CA 94040 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Barry 874 Partridge Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | 04 /
WURSTER, Stefan 2171 Bella Vita Place Livermore CA 94550 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
SMITH, Euan 10 Rampton Drift Longstanton Cambridgeshire CB24 2EH / GB | ||
02 /
PAGE, Richard 932 Trophy Drive Moutain View CA 94040 / US | |||
03 /
THOMPSON, Barry 874 Partridge Avenue Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
WURSTER, Stefan 2171 Bella Vita Place Livermore CA 94550 / US | Representative(s) | Sharp, Alan Cooper Cambridge Display Technology Limited IP Department Building 2020 Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire CB23 6DW / GB | [2010/28] | Application number, filing date | 08806443.1 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008GB03293 | Priority number, date | GB20070019512 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: GB 0719512 | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009044114 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2206102 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
G09G3/3283 (EP,US);
G09G3/3208 (GB);
G09G2310/0208 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2330/028 (EP,US);
G09G3/2011 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ANPASSUNG DER STROMVERSORGUNGSSPANNUNG FÜR STROMGESTEUERTE EL-ANZEIGEN | [2010/28] | English: | DYNAMIC ADAPTATION OF THE POWER SUPPLY VOLTAGE FOR CURRENT-DRIVEN EL DISPLAYS | [2010/28] | French: | ADAPTATION DYNAMIQUE DE LA TENSION D'ALIMENTATION POUR DES ÉCRANS ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTS À COMMANDE DE COURANT | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 12.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 15.04.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 07.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03107318 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO2006057213 (ROHM CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]US2006119551 (CHAUSSY DANIKE [FR], et al); | [PX]US2008042583 (KOBAYASHI MASATO [JP]) |