EP2203069 - METHOD OF ANIMAL SLAUGHTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nofima Mat AS Norwegian Food Research Institute Osloveien 1 1430 Ås / NO | For all designated states Havforskningsinstituttet Nordnesgaten 50 5817 Bergen / NO | For:GB
Cockbain, Julian St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLINDE, Erik Bioparken AS Frederik A Dahls vei 20 N-1432 As / NO | 02 /
SORHEIM, Oddvin Bioparken AS Frederik A Dahls vei 20 N-1432 As / NO | 03 /
HUNT, Melvin Bioparken AS Frederik A Dahls vei 20 N-1432 As / NO | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Cockbain, Julian Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Cockbain, Julian Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08806585.9 | 10.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008GB03453 | Priority number, date | GB20070019794 | 10.10.2007 Original published format: GB 0719794 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009047531 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203069 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A22B3/08 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
A22B3/083 (EP,US);
A22B3/005 (EP,US);
A22B3/06 (US);
A22B3/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Extension states | AL | 07.05.2010 | BA | 07.05.2010 | MK | 07.05.2010 | RS | 07.05.2010 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHLACHTEN VON TIEREN | [2010/27] | English: | METHOD OF ANIMAL SLAUGHTER | [2010/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ABATTAGE D'ANIMAUX | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]JPS61141835 ; | [AD]GB135023 (PRESCOTT G) [AD] 1-12* page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10 *; | [XY]US2526037 (MURPHY LAURENCE W) [X] 1,2,6-9,12 * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 43; figures 1,2; claims 1-7 * [Y] 5; | [Y]DE8701791U (TOENNIES, BERND, 4840 RHEDA-WIEDENBRUECK, DE) [Y] 5 * pages 2,3 *; | [XD] - "Pretreatment of animals prior to slaughter - involves making animal breathe carbon monoxide", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 32, Database accession no. 1986-208915, XP002507314 & JPS61141835 A 19860628 (IIMURA TOKO; ISHII TSUTOMU; KONISHI KUNIHARU) [XD] 1-4,6,8-11 * column A * |