EP2209985 - APPARATUS FOR FEEDING A FUEL, IN PARTICULAR LPG, TO AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X-TECH R&P S.A. Viale Carlo Cattaneo 1 6901 Lugano / CH | [2015/15] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states X-tech R&p S.a. Viale Carlo Cattaneo 1 6901 Lugano / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASAGLIA, Rubens Via Ziano di Sotto 20 I-44012 Sasso Marconi (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
WANG, Qiong Yanjiang Road 28 Taoyuan County Hunan / CN | [2015/15] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
BASAGLIA, Rubens Via Ziano di Sotto 20 I-44012 Sasso Marconi (Bologna) / IT | ||
02 /
WANG, Qiong Yanjiang Road 28 Taoyuan County Hunan / CN | Representative(s) | Fanzini, Valeriano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2015/15] |
Former [2010/30] | Fanzini, Valeriano Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 08807149.3 | 24.09.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008IB02489 | Priority number, date | IT2007BO00659 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: IT BO20070659 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009040637 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2209985 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2209985 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/00, F02M21/02, F16K43/00, F16L29/02, F02M37/10 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
F02M21/0242 (EP,US);
F02D19/0647 (EP,US);
F02M21/0221 (EP,US);
F02M21/0245 (EP,US);
F02M37/10 (EP,US);
F02D19/029 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG EINES KRAFTSTOFFS, INSBESONDERE VON LPG, ZU EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2010/30] | English: | APPARATUS FOR FEEDING A FUEL, IN PARTICULAR LPG, TO AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2010/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DÉLIVRER UN CARBURANT, EN PARTICULIER DU GPL, À UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 18.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.02.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2012 | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2008 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | IT | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | NL | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | LU | 24.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 08.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB118658 (WHITEHEAD JOHN SCARBOROUGH, et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 5 - line 20 * * page 2, line 46 * * page 3, line 17 - line 33 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2005001194 (BACHELDER PATRICK E [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0025] * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO0113025 (LEGGITT S H CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US2005116190 (ADAMS PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0031] * * figures 3,4; claims 1,10 *; | [A]US2006027776 (PIERSON ERIK E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0022]; figures 1,6 * | Examination | EP1447556 | by applicant | US6743365 |