EP2180982 - HAIR TRIMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2014/43] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROYLE, Terence, Gordon 18 Kings Orchard Oakley Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 7AX / GB | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/18] | 01 /
ROYLE, Terence, Gordon 18 Kings Orchard Oakley Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 7AX / GB | Representative(s) | Kohol, Sonia, et al Technical Centres Limited Procter & Gamble Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2013/43] | Pierce, Christopher James, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2013/24] | Kohol, Sonia Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2013/11] | Pedley, Michael Ewan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2012/34] | Chandrani, Vandita Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2011/21] | Pierce, Christopher James Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2010/18] | Chandrani, Vandita Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08807489.3 | 28.08.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008IB53494 | Priority number, date | US20070897839 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: US 897839 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009027945 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180982 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2180982 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/10, B26B19/06 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B26B19/102 (EP,US);
B26B19/063 (EP,US);
B26B19/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | HAARSCHNEIDEGERÄT | [2010/18] | English: | HAIR TRIMMER | [2010/18] | French: | RASOIR EFFILEUR | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 13.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2008 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BE | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | ES | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | IT | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | NL | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 28.08.2008 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US458940 (BONHAM WALTER R) [X] 1 * column 1, line 32 - column 4, line 65; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2485787 (JOHN SUTCH) [A] 1* column 2, lines 17-39; figure 2 *; | [X]WO0037225 (BRAUN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 2; figures 2,3,6,7 *; | [XA]US2003126744 (LAU TUNG YAN [HK], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * paragraphs [0037] - [0044]; figures 3-6 * [A] 4; | [AD]WO2005002806 (BRAUN GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * page 6, paragraph 4; figures 8,9 * |