EP2284368 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/07] | EXHAUST GAS PURIFIER | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Hiroshi c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | 02 /
HARA, Michihiko c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | 03 /
SHIOZAKI, Shuji c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | 04 /
MATSUYAMA, Hiroshi c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
MASUDA, Hiroshi c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | ||
02 /
HARA, Michihiko c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIOZAKI, Shuji c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUYAMA, Hiroshi c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chaya-machi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2011/07] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08810350.2 | 10.09.2008 | [2014/45] | WO2008JP66296 | Priority number, date | JP20080116983 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008116983 | [2011/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133635 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284368 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2284368 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/02, B01D53/86, B01D53/94 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
F02D41/029 (EP,US);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,US);
F01N2430/00 (EP,US);
F01N2560/08 (EP,US);
F01N3/023 (EP,US);
F02D2041/026 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0812 (EP,US);
F02D29/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2014/45] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFIER | [2014/45] | French: | PURIFICATEUR DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2014/45] |
Former [2011/07] | ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2011/07] | EXHAUST GAS PURIFIER | ||
Former [2011/07] | PURIFICATEUR DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2010 | Translation filed | 28.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 09.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2008 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | HR | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | NO | 05.02.2015 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.09.2008 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005337062 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2004137968 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [Y]JP2003106137 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2001280121 |