EP2331442 - MANAGEMENT OF POWER FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES BASED ON ELEVATOR USAGE PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company Ten Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERONESI, William A. c/o Otis Elevator Company Ten Farm Springs Road Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | 02 /
OGGIANU, Stella M. c/o Otis Elevator Company Ten Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
VERONESI, William A. c/o Otis Elevator Company Ten Farm Springs Road Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | ||
02 /
OGGIANU, Stella M. c/o Otis Elevator Company Ten Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/43] |
Former [2011/24] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08815627.8 | 04.09.2008 | [2011/24] | WO2008US10381 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010027346 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2331442 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2331442 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/30 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
B66B1/302 (EP,US);
B66B1/30 (KR);
B66B1/34 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON ENERGIE AUS MEHREREN QUELLEN AUF GRUNDLAGE VON AUFZUGEINSATZMUSTERN | [2011/24] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF POWER FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES BASED ON ELEVATOR USAGE PATTERNS | [2011/24] | French: | GESTION DE PUISSANCE À PARTIR DE MULTIPLES SOURCES SUR LA BASE DE MOTIFS D'UTILISATION D'ASCENSEUR | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2008 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001011618 (TAJIMA SHINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-8* claims 1,7 *; | [XA]JP2005324884 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,8 * abstract * [A] 9,16 |