EP2162369 - MEDIA STORAGE CONTAINER, APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CD3, Inc. 15505 Long Vista Drive Austin, TX 78728 / US | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETT, Tod, Allan 2102 Ringtail Ridge Austin, TX 78746 / US | 02 /
HUNT, Ronald, Eugene 221 Buck Bend Georgetown, TX 78628 / US | 03 /
WHITEHEAD, Verlon, Eugene 8815 Mesa Drive Austin, TX 78759 / US | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08825908.0 | 17.06.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008US67238 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2012/13] |
Former [2010/11] | US20070762505 | 13.06.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008154659 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2162369 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/57 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
G11B33/0472 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | MEDIENSPEICHERBEHÄLTER, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2010/11] | English: | MEDIA STORAGE CONTAINER, APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2010/11] | French: | CONTENANT, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE DE SUPPORTS | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 14.07.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6860572 (PAGES GARY M [US]) [Y] 1-19 * , entire document, especially col 1, In 33-48; col 2, In 23-33; col 2, In 38-43; col 3, In 20-67; col 4, In 1-39; fig. 1; fig. 1 ? item 60; fig. 2; fig. 2 ? items 52, 122 *; | [Y]US5683153 (OHTA MINEKO [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document, especially col 1, In 62-67; col 2, In 1-6; col 2, In 32-39; col 2, In 40-43; col 3, In 11-61; col 5, In 43-54 *; | [Y]US6729753 (ARTMAN RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 9, 20 * , entire document, especially Abstract *; | [Y]US6003855 (BEAUFORT RICHARD F [US], et al) [Y] 2 * , entire document, especially Abstract; and col 7, In 19-22 * |