EP2153223 - COMPUTATIONAL DIAGNOSTIC METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING ORGANISMS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states febit holding GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 519 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Febit Holding Gmbh Im Neuenheimer Feld 519 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUSO, Anthony, Peter 35 Woodchuck Hill Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08826169.8 | 02.05.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008US05625 | Priority number, date | US20070915584P | 02.05.2007 Original published format: US 915584 P | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009008942 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2153223 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G01N33/48, G01N33/50, // C12Q1/68 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
G16B30/00 (EP,US);
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
G16B25/20 (EP,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | G01N33/48, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RECHENDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON ORGANISMEN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2010/07] | English: | COMPUTATIONAL DIAGNOSTIC METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING ORGANISMS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2010/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DIAGNOSTIC QUANTITATIF POUR IDENTIFIER DES ORGANISMES, ET LEURS APPLICATIONS | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 16.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/27] | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - HAUGLAND R A ET AL, "Identification of putative sequence specific PCR primers for detection of the toxigenic fungal speciesStachybotrys chartarum", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1006/MCPR.1998.0197, (19981201), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0890-8508, pages 387 - 396, XP004450121 [I] 1-3,7-9 * figures 3,4 * * page 388, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 393, column r, paragraph 2 - page 395, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1998.0197 | [I] - RENKER CARSTEN ET AL, "Combining nested PCR and restriction digest of the internal transcribed spacer region to characterize arbuscular mycorrhizal fungi on roots from the field.", MYCORRHIZA AUG 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12938031, (200308), vol. 13, no. 4, ISSN 0940-6360, pages 191 - 198, XP002577410 [I] 1-3,7-9 * figure 2 * * page 192, column r, paragraph 4 - page 197, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00572-002-0214-5 | International search | [X]US2005050101 (VOCKLEY JOSEPH G [US], et al); | [Y]US2006204996 (KWON TAE-JOON [KR], et al) |