EP2175895 - OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A TERPENE AND A NATURAL POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bausch & Lomb Incorporated One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, NY 14604-2701 / US | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKE, Susan, E. 3 Harrold Square Batavia, NY 14020 / US | 02 /
SCHEUER, Catherine, A. 59 Gingerwood Way West Henrietta, NY 14586 / US | 03 /
MILLARD, Kimberly, L. 200 Bonnie Brae Rochester, NY 14618 / US | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08826810.7 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008US70952 | Priority number, date | US20070953219P | 01.08.2007 Original published format: US 953219 P | US20080177171 | 22.07.2008 Original published format: US 177171 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009018060 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175895 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L12/14 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
A61L12/14 (EP,US);
A61L12/142 (EP,US);
A61L12/143 (EP,US);
A61L12/147 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM TERPEN UND EINEM NATÜRLICHEN POLYMER | [2010/16] | English: | OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A TERPENE AND A NATURAL POLYMER | [2010/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS OPHTALMIQUES COMPRENANT UN TERPÈNE ET UN POLYMÈRE NATUREL | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/33] | 18.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004034042 (TSUJI MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0191] , [0195] , [0198]; example 32 *; | [Y]US2002052419 (DOI KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0039] , [0042] , [0045] *; | [Y]EP1016406 (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0022] , [0023] , [0026] , [0029] *; | [Y]WO9606644 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, lines 10-24 * * page 17, lines 6-12 * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2006038080 (CLEARLAB PTE LTD [SG], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0014] , [0024] , [0028]; examples 1,2; claim - * |