EP2139325 - Bithionol as anti-angiogenic agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/01] | ANTI-ANGIOGENIC AGENTS AND METHODS OF USE | ||
[2014/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, PT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southern Research Institute Office of Commercialization And Intellectual Property 2000 9th Avenue South P.O. Box 55305 Birmingham, Alabama 35205 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QU, Zhican 705 Lake Crescent Circle Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | 02 /
ROY, Anshu, Mittal c/o Southern Research Institute Office of Commercialization and IP 2000 9th Avenue South P.O. Box 55305 Birmingham, Alabama 3520 / US | 03 /
ANANTHAN, Subramaniam 1816 Forest Haven Lane Birmingham, AL 35216 / US | [2015/03] |
Former [2010/10] | 01 /
QU, Zhican 705 Lake Crescent Circle Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | ||
02 /
ROY, Anshu, Mittal c/o Southern Research Institute Office of Commercialization and IP 2000 9th Avenue South P.O. Box 55305 Birmingham, Alabama 3520 / US | |||
03 /
ANANTHAN, Subramaniam 1816 Forest Haven Lane Birmingham, AL 35216 / US | |||
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
QU, Zhican 705 Lake Crescent Circle Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | ||
02 /
ROY, Anshu, Mittal 1407 17th Way South Birmingham, AL 35205 / US | |||
03 /
ANANTHAN, Subramaniam 1816 Forest Haven Lane Birmingham, AL 35216 / US | Representative(s) | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/01] | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08827229.9 | 14.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US60186 | Priority number, date | US20070911645P | 13.04.2007 Original published format: US 911645 P | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009023299 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2139325 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139325 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/54, C07D239/42, C07D471/04, A61K31/095, A61K31/10, A61K31/09, A61P43/00, A61P35/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/542 (KR);
A61K31/095 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4465 (KR);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5415 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | A01N43/54, C07D239/42, C07D471/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bithionol als Anti-Angiogenese-Mittel | [2014/37] | English: | Bithionol as anti-angiogenic agent | [2014/37] | French: | Bithionol comme agent anti-angiogénique | [2014/37] |
Former [2010/01] | ANTI-ANGIOGENESE-MITTEL UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2010/01] | ANTI-ANGIOGENIC AGENTS AND METHODS OF USE | ||
Former [2010/01] | AGENTS ANTI-ANGIOGÉNIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 16.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP09178514.7 / EP2161023 | EP11188940.8 / EP2420230 | EP11188941.6 / EP2420236 | EP11188943.2 / EP2420238 | EP11188944.0 / EP2420239 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2008 | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | GB | 14.04.2015 | IE | 14.04.2015 | IT | 14.04.2015 | LU | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | FR | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | PT | 14.05.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GB | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
IT | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/35] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GB | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
IT | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GB | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
IT | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GB | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
IT | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GB | 14.04.2015 | ||
IT | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GB | 14.04.2015 | ||
IT | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GB | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 14.01.2015 | |
NO | 14.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US2007225238 (CHARLIER HENRY A JR [US]) [XP] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 14,28; claim - * * figures 3A,3B *; | [X]WO0045165 (CYTOVIA INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph l - page 14, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph l - page 16, paragraph 1 * * Table 3, page 40: compound G08 "bithionolate sodium" * * page 51, line 14 - line 27 * * claims 38,40,42 *; | [X]US2005250709 (KHODADOUST MEHRAN [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 40 * * page 4, paragraph 47 * * page 5, paragraphs 54,55; claims 6-8 *; | [X]WO2007005670 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 7 * * page 4, paragraph 10 * * page 5, paragraph 13; claims 1,3,6 *; | CN1562930 [ ] (CHINESE MEDICINE & NATURAL MED [CN]); | [A]WO02060375 (INSIGHT STRATEGY AND MARKETING [IL], et al) [A] 1-3 * claims 1,2,21-27 *; | [X] - XU Y-M ET AL, "Polybrominated diphenyl ethers from a sponge of the Dysidea genus that inhibit Tie2 kinase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, (20050201), vol. 13, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2004.10.061, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 657 - 659, XP004710829 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2004.10.061 | [X] - YAO, XINSHENG ET AL, "Extraction of derivatives of polyhalogenated diphenyl ethers from Phyllospongia and their medical applications", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20051012), Database accession no. 2005:1089487, URL: STN, XP002656515 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19951121), Database accession no. 170473-64-0, XP002656516 [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19841116), Database accession no. 80246-27-1, XP002656517 [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19841116), Database accession no. 80246-26-0, XP002656518 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - BINQIU LIU ET AL, "Triclosan inhibits enoyl-reductase of type I fatty acid synthase in vitro and is cytotoxic to MCF-7 and SKBr-3 breast cancer cells", CANCER CHEMOTHERAPY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (20020301), vol. 49, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s00280-001-0399-x, ISSN 0344-5704, pages 187 - 193, XP055004251 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00280-001-0399-x | [X] - S. LU, "Fatty acid synthase is a potential molecular target for the chemoprevention of breast cancer", CARCINOGENESIS, (20040101), vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1093/carcin/bgh278, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 153 - 157, XP055004247 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/bgh278 | [A] - Berea Williams et al., "Inhibitors of human carbonyl reductase", Journal of the Idaho Academy of Science, (200506), URL: http://findarticles.com/p/articles/mi_hb182/is_1_41/ai_n29221077/, (20110809), XP002656519 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2007041409 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al); | [A]US2006018934 (VAYA NAVIN [IN], et al); | [A]WO03070249 (NOWAK GOETZ [DE], et al) | Examination | - CORBETT ET AL., Discovery of Solid Tumor Active Agents Using a Soft-Agar-Colony-Formation Disk-Diffusion-Assay, vol. CHAPT. 3, pages 35 - 87 |