EP2186144 - MULTI-FREQUENCY ANTENNA WITH ACTIVE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/20] | ANTENNA WITH ACTIVE ELEMENTS | ||
[2017/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethertronics, Inc. 9605 Scranton Road, Suite 300 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2017/40] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Ethertronics, Inc. 9605 Scranton Road, Suite 300 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAMBLIN, Jeffrey 718 Avenida Leon San Marcos, California 92069 / US | 02 /
HAN, Chulmin 13156 Kellam Court 127 San Diego California 92130 / US | 03 /
JONES, Rowland 1805 Nicolia Drive 204 Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | 04 /
ROWSON, Sebastian 512 Clairemont Dr. 315 San Diego, California 92117 / US | 05 /
DESCLOS, Laurent 5392 Via Alcazar San Diego, California 92111 / US | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/20] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08827677.9 | 19.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008US73612 | Priority number, date | US20070841207 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: US 841207 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009026304 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186144 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186144 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/00, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/14, H01Q9/42, H01Q5/321, H01Q5/392, H01Q5/371, H01Q5/385 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q5/321 (EP,US);
H01Q5/371 (EP,US);
H01Q5/385 (EP,US);
H01Q5/392 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0442 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/00, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/14, H01Q9/42 | ||
Former IPC [2010/20] | H01L35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MULTIFREQUENZANTENNE MIT AKTIVEN ELEMENTEN | [2017/17] | English: | MULTI-FREQUENCY ANTENNA WITH ACTIVE ELEMENTS | [2017/17] | French: | ANTENNE MULTIFRÉQUENCES À ÉLÉMENTS ACTIFS | [2017/18] |
Former [2010/20] | ANTENNE MIT AKTIVEN ELEMENTEN | ||
Former [2010/20] | ANTENNA WITH ACTIVE ELEMENTS | ||
Former [2010/20] | ANTENNE À ÉLÉMENTS ACTIFS | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.04.2017 | 03.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2008 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.08.2008 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1396906 (FILTRONIC LK OY [FI]); | [XI]WO2004047222 (ETHERTRONICS INC [US]); | [XI]EP1544943 (FILTRONIC LK OY [FI]); | [XI]US2006044187 (SAGER MADS [DK], et al); | [XI]US2007069958 (OZKAR METE [US]); | International search | [Y]US2004027286 (POILASNE GREGORY [US], et al); | [Y]US2005192727 (SHOSTAK OLEKSANDR T [UA], et al); | [X]US2006220966 (SARYCHEV ANDREY [US], et al) | Examination | WO03096474 | US2004041734 | EP1538703 | by applicant | WO2004047222 |