EP2170497 - EXCHANGER REACTOR HAVING A BAYONET TUBE ALLOWING OPERATION WITH PRESSURE DIFFERENCES OF THE ORDER OF 100 BAR BETWEEN THE TUBE SIDE AND THE SHELL SIDE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states IFP 1 et 4 Avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIROUDIERE, Fabrice 0197, chemin du Creux F-69530 Orlienas / FR | 02 /
TRICARD, Jean, Christian 113, rue Maximilien Robespierre F-91550 Paray Vielle Poste / FR | 03 /
LANGLOS, Bernard 25, rue Jean Paul Lamare F-78100 ST Germain en Laye / FR | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 08827689.4 | 24.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008FR00888 | Priority number, date | FR20070005316 | 20.07.2007 Original published format: FR 0705316 | [2010/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009024664 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170497 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/06, B01J19/24, F28D7/12 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
B01J8/062 (EP,US);
B01J19/2425 (EP,US);
B01J8/067 (EP,US);
F28D7/12 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00176 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00221 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00504 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00769 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00796 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | B01J8/06, B01J19/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | AUSTAUSCHREAKTOR MIT EINEM BAJONETTRÖHRCHEN FÜR BETRIEB MIT DRUCKDIFFERENZEN VON CA. 100 BAR ZWISCHEN DER ROHR- UND DER HÜLLENSEITE | [2010/14] | English: | EXCHANGER REACTOR HAVING A BAYONET TUBE ALLOWING OPERATION WITH PRESSURE DIFFERENCES OF THE ORDER OF 100 BAR BETWEEN THE TUBE SIDE AND THE SHELL SIDE. | [2010/14] | French: | REACTEUR ECHANGEUR A TUBE BAÏONNETTE PERMETTANT DE FONCTIONNER AVEC DES DIFFERENCES DE PRESSION DE L'ORDRE DE 100 BARS ENTRE LE COTE TUBE ET LE COTE CALANDRE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3119671 (RUSSELL JAMES GEORGE, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 20 - line 40 * * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 61 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 36; figure - *; | [X]US3220385 (JAN SELLIN) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 9 - line 20 * * column 3, line 41 - line 48 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 39; figure - *; | [A]FR2374076 (OTTO & CO GMBH DR C [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 38 - page 2, line 38 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 40; figure - *; | [X]GB2050413 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 117 - line 127 * * page 2, line 85 - line 87 * * page 3, line 58 - line 73 * * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 20; figure - *; | [X]FR2588564 (VYZK USTAV CHEM ZARIZENI [CS]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - line 25 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 34 - page 8, line 15; figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5935531 (GIACOBBE FRANCESCO [IT]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - line 65 * * column 3, line 66 - column 7, line 4; figure - *; | [A]WO0156690 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 13 ** page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 17; figure - * | by applicant | FR610999 | US3119671 | US3220385 | GB2050413 | FR2588564 | US5935531 |