EP2190522 - STIMULATION FIELD MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGEN, Michael, D. 5250 Keats Avenue N. Lake Elmo, MN 55042 / US | 02 /
SOMMER, John, L. 12788 Ibis Street NW Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US | 03 /
EBERT, Michael 1525 Berne Circle W. Fridley, MN 55421 / US | 04 /
BOURN, David, Wayne 11750 Tulip Street NW Apt. 323 Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | 05 /
MIYAZAWA, Gabriela, C. 1552 Woodside Court NE Fridley, MN 55432 / US | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08827755.3 | 20.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008US09924 | Priority number, date | US20070956832P | 20.08.2007 Original published format: US 956832 P | US20070956868P | 20.08.2007 Original published format: US 956868 P | US20080049240 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 49240 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009025828 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190522 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A61N1/0565 (EP,US);
A61N2001/0585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | STIMULATIONSFELD-MANAGEMENT | [2010/22] | English: | STIMULATION FIELD MANAGEMENT | [2010/22] | French: | GESTION DE CHAMP DE STIMULATION | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 25.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 26.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5755766 (CHASTAIN STUART R [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,13-15 * columns 1,4; figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO0103767 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [X] 1-8,13-15 * pages 5,6; figures 1,2C *; | [X]US2004193240 (MICHEL ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-15 * figure 1 *; | [PX]WO2008094879 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [PX] 11-14* pages 3,7; figure 1 * |