EP2201161 - CHROME-PLATED PART AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
MKS IP Association Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states ATOTECH Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Soichiro c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Int. Prop. Dep. 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
KOYASU, Hiroaki c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SAKAI, Hiroshi c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | 04 /
KEERS, Grant c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | 05 /
GEISSLER, Jeans-Eric c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2015/03] | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Soichiro c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Int. Prop. Dep. 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | ||
02 /
KOYASU, Hiroaki c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Hiroshi c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
KEERS, Grant c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Soichiro c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Int. Prop. Dep. 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | ||
02 /
KOYASU, Hiroaki c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Hiroshi c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
KEERS, Grant c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08828191.0 | 27.08.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008JP02327 | Priority number, date | JP20070223954 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007223954 | JP20080177529 | 08.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008177529 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009028182 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2201161 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201161 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2201161 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/34, C25D3/06, C25D9/08, C25D5/12, // C25D3/10, C25D5/48 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C25D11/38 (EP,US);
C25D3/06 (EP,US);
C25D3/10 (EP,US);
C25D5/14 (EP,US);
C25D5/34 (EP,US);
C25D5/40 (US);
C25D5/623 (EP,US);
C25D5/625 (EP,US);
C25D5/627 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | C25D5/34, C25D3/06, C25D11/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERCHROMTES TEIL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/26] | English: | CHROME-PLATED PART AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF THE SAME | [2010/26] | French: | ÉLÉMENT CHROMÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 28.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2008 | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | IE | 27.08.2015 | LU | 27.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 14.01.2015 | |
NO | 14.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2136020 (ZINCROKSID SPA) [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document * * page 5, lines 10-15 * [Y] 1-11; | [X]US4875983 (ALOTA SANTA [IT], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 4, lines 30-58 * * column 6, lines 21-31 * * table 1 *; | [Y]US2004194859 (ASOU YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * claims 1-3 * * paragraph [0025] *; | [DX]JP2005232529 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [DX] 1-3,7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0021] , [0022] *; | [X]JP2007056282 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0024] * |