EP2181401 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COMPUTING A VARIOGRAM MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landmark Graphics Corporation, A Halliburton Company 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, TX 77032 / US | [2021/20] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Landmark Graphics Corporation, A Halliburton Company 2101, City West Boulevard Building 2, 15th Floor Houston, TX 77042-3021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Genbao 17523 Indian Springs Court Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | 02 /
CHAMBERS, Richard, L. 9648 East 119th Place South Bixby, OK 74008 / US | 03 /
YARUS, Jeffrey, M. 5234 North Braeswood Houston, TX 77096 / US | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/30] |
Former [2014/07] | Benson, Christopher, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2010/18] | Benson, Christopher Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08828858.4 | 27.08.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008US74510 | Priority number, date | US20070968289P | 27.08.2007 Original published format: US 968289 P | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009029679 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2181401 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181401 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01V99/00, G06F17/18 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G06F17/18 (EP,US);
G01V1/301 (EP);
G01V1/307 (EP);
G01V20/00 (EP);
G01V2210/641 (EP);
G01V2210/665 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/18] | G06F17/18, G01V1/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BERECHNUNG EINES VARIOGRAMMMODELLS | [2010/18] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COMPUTING A VARIOGRAM MODEL | [2010/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CALCUL D'UN MODÈLE DE VARIOGRAMME | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 20.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2021 | 26.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.02.2021 | 25.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2008 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | IE | 27.08.2021 | LU | 27.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | FR | 28.09.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | DE | 01.03.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
TR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 27.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
DE | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 27.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
DE | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 27.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
DE | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 27.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
DE | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 27.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
DE | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
DE | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
DE | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 27.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X] - Spatial Analysis and Decision Assistance (SADA) Version 4.1 - User Guide, (200505), XP002561553 [X] 1-27 * page 1 * * page 90, section "Direction of anisotropy" to page 97, end of section "Rose diagram" * | Examination | - SINHA S P ET AL, "A Novel Approach to Reservoir Surveillance Planning", vol. SPE-88792-MS, doi:10.2118/88792-MS, ISBN 978-1-61399-008-7, (2004), ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION - CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS / 11TH ADIPEC, ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL PETROLEUM EXHIBITION & CONFERENCE : 10 - 13 OCTOBER 2004, ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL EXHI, URL: http://www.onepetro.org/doi/10.2118/88792-MS, (20130404), XP009525091 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/88792-MS | - SAHIN A ET AL, "Geological Controls of Variograms in a Complex Carbonate Reservoir, Eastern Province, Saudi Arabia", MATHEMATICAL GEOLOGY, (1998), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 309 - 322, XP055767371 | - Yarus J et al, "Practical Geostatistics - An Armchair Overview for Petroleum Reservoir Engineers", Journal of Petroleum Technology, doi:10.2118/103357-MS, (200611), pages 78 - 86, URL: http://www.onepetro.org/google/Papers/SPE/eJournal_Papers/spe/2006/JPT/11/SPE-103357-MS/SPE-103357-MS.pdf?id=SPE-103357-MS&soc=SPE, (20150930), XP055217155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/103357-MS | - Coburn T C et al, "Modeling the Semivariogram : Principles, Methods, and Case Studies, Volume II : New Approach, Methods Comparison, and Simulation Study", Stochastic Modeling and Geostatistics : Principles, Methods, and Case Studies, Volume II, American Association of Petroleum Geologists, (2006), pages 45 - 57, doi:10.1306/1063806CA53228, ISBN 978-1-62981-036-2, XP055768212 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1306/1063806CA53228 | - Marian Eriksson ET AL, "Understanding Anisotropy Computations", Mathematical Geology, (2000), URL: https://link.springer.com/article/10.1023/A:1007590322263, XP055767699 |