17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
18.04.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
06.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
10.05.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.12.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
07.12.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
14.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
30.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2011 |
First examination report |
|
28.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.11.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
24.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
02.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
02.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
01.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|