EP2186859 - TUBE AND MEDICAL DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUWAHARA, Shigenao c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 36 Towada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0197 / JP | 02 /
OONUMA, Hidetaka c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 36 Towada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0197 / JP | [2015/27] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
KUWAHARA, Shigenao c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 36 Towada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0197 / JP | ||
02 /
OONUMA, Hidetaka c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 36 Towada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0197 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/27] |
Former [2010/20] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08829895.5 | 04.09.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008JP65994 | Priority number, date | JP20070232687 | 07.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007232687 | JP20080189274 | 23.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008189274 | [2010/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009031625 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186859 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186859 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/02, A61L29/00, C08L23/00 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
A61L29/049 (EP,US);
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
C08L2203/18 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L29/049, C08L23/00 (EP,US);
A61L29/049, C08L53/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TUBUS UND MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2010/20] | English: | TUBE AND MEDICAL DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2010/20] | French: | TUBE ET DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL LE COMPRENANT | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2010 | Translation filed | 04.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 28.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2008 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MT | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | IE | 04.09.2015 | LU | 04.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04159344 (TERUMO CORP) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [YD]JPH1067894 (KURARAY CO) [YD] 1-8* abstract * | International search | [X]JP2003287163 (KURARAY PLASTICS CO) [X] 1-8 * , Claims; Par. Nos. [0013], [0028] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004124070 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-8* , Claims; Par. No. [0001] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004346109 (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-8 * , Claims 1, 5; Par. Nos. [0109], [0123] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2006134974 (NIPRO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , Claims; Par. No. [0007] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH02300250 | JPH04159344 | JPH1067894 | JP2001001432 | JP2002248671 | JP2003287163 | JP2004194803 |