EP2188884 - MOTOR CONTROLLER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAXIMIZING ENERGY SAVINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Powerwise Group, Inc. 6100 Broken Sound Parkway NW, Suite 1 Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US | [2015/31] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states The Powerwise Group, Inc. 4855 Technology Way, Suite 550 Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLEY, Paul, H. 606 Elm Tree Lane Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2017/22] |
Former [2011/38] | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08830045.4 | 15.09.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008US10720 | Priority number, date | US20070993706P | 14.09.2007 Original published format: US 993706 P | US20080135402P | 21.07.2008 Original published format: US 135402 P | US20080207913 | 10.09.2008 Original published format: US 207913 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009035696 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188884 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2188884 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/38, H02P5/00, H02P23/02, H02P23/08, H02P29/02, H02P23/14 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
H02P23/02 (EP,US);
H02P23/0004 (EP,US);
H02P23/0077 (US);
H02P23/08 (EP,US);
H02P23/14 (EP,US);
H02P23/26 (EP,US);
H02P25/24 (US);
H02P29/02 (EP,US);
H02P6/182 (EP,US);
H02P6/28 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | H02K21/38, H02P5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOTORSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR MAXIMALE ENERGIEEINSPARUNG | [2010/21] | English: | MOTOR CONTROLLER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAXIMIZING ENERGY SAVINGS | [2010/21] | French: | RÉGULATEUR DE MOTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MAXIMISATION DES ÉCONOMIES D'ÉNERGIE | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2015 | 30.09.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2016 | 30.09.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2008 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | IT | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | NL | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IE | 15.09.2017 | LU | 15.09.2017 | MT | 15.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.09.2008 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
MT | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.09.2008 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
MT | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.09.2008 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
MT | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
MT | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0330477 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * column 5, line 53 - column 9, line 59; figures 1-9 *; | [I]US2006038530 (HOLLING GEORGE [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [I] - SUL S K ET AL, "A NOVEL TECHNIQUE FOR OPTIMAL EFFICIENCY CONTROL OF A CURRENT-SOURCE INVERTER-FED INDUCTION MOTOR", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19880401), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1109/63.4349, ISSN 0885-8993, pages 192 - 199, XP002063874 [I] 1-15 * page 2, column l, line 9 - page 4, column l, line 29; figures 4-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/63.4349 | [I] - FLEMMING ABRAHAMSEN ET AL, "On the Energy Optimized Control of Standard and High-Efficiency Induction Motors in CT and HVAC Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19980801), vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 0093-9994, XP011022398 [I] 1-15 * page 4, column r, line 11 - page 5, column l, line 5; figure 9 * | International search | [X]US5828200 (LIGMAN JAMES R [US], et al); | [Y]US6449567 (DESAI BINISH P [US], et al); | [A]US2007069668 (MACKAY DAVID K [CA]); | [A]US5350988 (LE DONG T [US]); | [A]US3718846 (BEJACH B) | by applicant | EP0330477 |