EP2194424 - MULTIPLE-PRIMARY-COLOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEKI, Shun c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Kohzoh c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Akiko c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08830167.6 | 11.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008JP02517 | Priority number, date | JP20070238126 | 13.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007238126 | [2010/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009034714 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2194424 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/20, G02F1/1343, G02F1/133, G02F1/1335, G09G3/20, G09G3/36 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
G09G3/3607 (EP,US);
G02F2201/52 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0443 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0876 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/028 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0457 (EP,US);
G09G2340/06 (EP,US);
G09G3/3614 (EP,US);
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G09G5/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/23] | G02F1/1343, G02F1/133, G02F1/1335, G09G3/20, G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN PRIMÄRFARBEN | [2010/23] | English: | MULTIPLE-PRIMARY-COLOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2010/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES À COULEURS PRIMAIRES MULTIPLES | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2010 | Translation filed | 12.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 31.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 03.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO02101644 (GENOA COLOR TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-15 * page 5, line 8 - line 10 * * page 14, line 32 - page 16, line 7 * * page 18, line 1 - line 7 * * page 19, line 8 - page 20, line 9 * * page 21, line 16 - line 18 * * page 25, line 29 - page 29, line 4 * * figures 12A,12B,13A * [Y] 3,4,11 [I] 8; | [XI]WO2004068460 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-15 * page 10, line 24 - line 27 * * page 11, line 4 - line 6 * * page 12, line 4 - line 10 * * page 13, line 3 - line 32 * * figures 8-15 * [I] 8; | [XDYI]JP2004529396 (GENOA TECHNOLOGIES LTD; BEN DAVID ILAN; ROTH SHMUEL; BEN CHORIN MOSHE) [XD] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,11 [I] 8; | [Y]US2005134785 (ROTH SHMUEL [IL], et al) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0063] * * figures 2,3A,3B,5 *; | [XI]US2005264587 (KURUMISAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 2A-3C,13,14 * [I] 8; | [A]WO2006098247 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2007063946 (NAKAMURA KOZO [JP], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0177] - paragraph [0185] * * figures 1,2 *; | [YD]WO2007034770 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [YD] 11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2005523465 ; | [A]WO2005101807 (CLAIRVOYANTE INC [US]); | [A]JP2007041595 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |