EP2195462 - PREDICTION OF SLEEP PARAMETER AND RESPONSE TO SLEEP-INDUCING COMPOUND BASED ON PER3 VNTR GENOTYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. 9605 Medical Center Drive, Suite 300 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. 9605 Medical Center Drive, Suite 300 Rockville NY 20850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVEDAN, Christian 22 Eldwick Court Potomac MD 20854 / US | 02 /
POLYMEROPOULOS, Mihael H. 11300 Ridge Mist Terrace Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 03 /
BIRZNIEKS, Gunther 6321 Tone Court Bethesda MD 20817 / US | [2013/09] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
LAVEDAN, Christian 22 Eldwick Court Potomac MD 20854 / US | ||
02 /
POLYMEROPOULOS, Mihael, H. 11300 RidgeMist Terrace Potomac MD 20854 / US | |||
03 /
BIRZNIEKS, Gunther 6321 Tone Court Bethesda MD 20817 / US | Representative(s) | Schiffer, Axel Martin, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Schiffer, Axel Martin, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/24] | Schiffer, Axel Martin, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08830209.6 | 12.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008US76147 | Priority number, date | US20070972196P | 13.09.2007 Original published format: US 972196 P | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009036257 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2195462 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195462 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61K31/16 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D307/81 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | PROGNOSE VON SCHLAFPARAMETERN UND REAKTIONEN AUF EINE SCHLAFFÖRDERNDE VERBINDUNG AUF BASIS DES GENOTYPS PER3 VNTR | [2010/24] | English: | PREDICTION OF SLEEP PARAMETER AND RESPONSE TO SLEEP-INDUCING COMPOUND BASED ON PER3 VNTR GENOTYPE | [2010/24] | French: | PRÉVISION D'UN PARAMÈTRE DU SOMMEIL ET DE LA RÉPONSE À UN COMPOSÉ INDUISANT LE SOMMEIL À BASE DU GÉNOTYPE DU MINISATELLITE (VNTR) PER3 | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 02.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2008 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | HR | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | GB | 12.09.2013 | IE | 12.09.2013 | LU | 12.09.2013 | NO | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GB | 12.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GB | 12.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GB | 12.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GB | 12.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
IE | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004038043 (UNIV SURREY [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10,11 * the whole document * * page 3 - page 4 * * page 9 - page 11; figure 1; claims 1-8 * * claims 22-32 * [Y] 12-18; | [Y]WO2005063297 (SEPRACOR INC [US], et al) [Y] 12-18 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO2007137244 (VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [PA] * the whole document *; | [A] - ARCHER S N ET AL, "A length polymorphism in the circadian clock gene PER3 is linked to delayed sleep syndrome and extreme diurnal preference", SLEEP, ALLEN PRESS, LAWRENCE, KS, US, (20030615), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 0161-8105, pages 4134 - 15, XP008029828 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - VIOLA ET AL, "PER3 Polymorphism Predicts Sleep Structure and Waking Performance", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, GB, (20070402), vol. 17, no. 7, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 613 - 618, XP022009295 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2007.01.073 | [A] - EBISAWA T ET AL, "ASSOCIATION OF STRUCTURAL POLYMORPHISMS IN THE HUMAN PERIOD3 GENE WITH DELAYED SLEEP PHASE SYNDROME", EMBO REPORTS, (20010101), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 342 - 346, XP001187591 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/embo-reports/kve070 | [DY] - NIMISH N VACHHARAJANI ET AL, "PRECLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS AND METABOLISM OF BMS-214778, A NOVEL MELATONIN RECEPTOR AGONIST", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE,, (20030401), vol. 92, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 760 - 772, XP008074135 [DY] 12-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.10348 | [A] - RAJARATNAM S M ET AL, "The melatonin agonist VEC-162 immediately phase-advances the human circadian system", SLEEP (ROCHESTER), & 20TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATED-PROFESSIONAL-SLEEP-SOCIETIES; SALT LAKE CITY, UT, USA; JUNE 17 -22, 2006, (2006), vol. 29, no. Suppl. S, ISSN 0161-8105, page A54, XP008098612 [A] * abstract * | [PA] - BIRZNIEKS G ET AL, "Melatonin agonist VEC-162 improves sleep onset and maintenance in a model of transient insomnia", SLEEP (ROCHESTER), & 21ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION-PROFESSIONAL-SLEEP-SOCIETIES; MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA; JUNE 09 -14, 2007, (2007), vol. 30, no. Suppl. S, ISSN 0161-8105, page A264, XP008098611 [PA] * abstract * |