EP2183836 - METHOD OF MONITORING A STANDBY GENERATOR AND SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Briggs and Stratton Corporation 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222 / US | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATZLER, Brandon, M. 32 Hidden Creek View Hartford WI 53027 / US | 02 /
STAIR, Kenny, J. 127 Chestnut Way North Prairie WI 53153 / US | 03 /
NORDMAN, Russell, C. N60 W25830 Walnut Road Sussex WI 53089 / US | 04 /
FIORENZA, John, A. 3580 Slinger Road Slinger WI 53086 / US | 05 /
SODEMANN, Wesley, C. W325 S3314 Mesa Trail Dousman WI 53118 / US | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08831879.5 | 17.09.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008US76638 | Priority number, date | US20070973623P | 19.09.2007 Original published format: US 973623 P | US20080022862 | 23.01.2008 Original published format: US 22862 | US20080027553 | 11.02.2008 Original published format: US 27553 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009039155 | Date: | 26.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2183836 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
G05B23/0216 (EP,US);
H02J9/066 (US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
G01R22/063 (EP,US);
H02J9/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES GENERATORS IM STANDBY-BETRIEB UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2010/19] | English: | METHOD OF MONITORING A STANDBY GENERATOR AND SYSTEM THEREFOR | [2010/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE DE PUISSANCE | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 03.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9855934 (ALPHA TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0182260 (AMERICAN POWER CONVERSION [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005091460 (AMERICAN POWER CONV CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2006018069 (GULL PHILIP [US], et al) [DA] 1-38 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] ** figure 1 *; | [A] - JARKOWSKI M ET AL, "New approach for management services with a Web browser", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991110), vol. 31, no. 21, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 2227 - 2236, XP002185729 [A] 1-38 * page 2230, right-hand column, lines 7-12 * | [A] - CHEMMANGOT V NAYAR ET AL, "A Grid-Interactive Photovoltaic Uninterruptible Power Supply System Using Battery Storage and a Back Up Diesel Generator", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20000901), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0885-8969, XP011015573 [A] 1-38 * sections "I. Introduction" and "II. System Description" * | by applicant | WO0182260 |