Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010255338 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007242346 | 19.09.2007 | WO2008JP66890 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5126996B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2013 | B2 | JPWO2009038151 | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009533186 | 18.09.2008 | JP2007242346 | 19.09.2007 | WO2008JP66890 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2202330 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2012 | A4 | EP2202330 | 30.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007242346 | 19.09.2007 | WO2008JP66890 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101802250 | 11.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007242346 | 19.09.2007 | WO2008JP66890 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009038151 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007242346 | 19.09.2007 |