EP2203783 - THICK FILM RESISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2015/17] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states AZ Electronic Materials USA Corp. 70 Meister Avenue Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUKHY, Medhat A. 10 Ewing Drive Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 02 /
PAUNESCU, Margareta 44 Studer Road Clinton, NJ 08809 / US | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Hans Christoph Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2019/46] |
Former [2010/27] | Rippel, Hans Christoph Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08833151.7 | 24.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008IB02593 | Priority number, date | US20070860675 | 25.09.2007 Original published format: US 860675 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009040661 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2203783 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203783 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
G03F7/0392 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/004 (KR);
G03F7/027 (KR);
G03F7/0275 (KR);
H01L21/0273 (KR);
H01L21/0274 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/46] |
Former [2010/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICKFILMRESISTS | [2010/27] | English: | THICK FILM RESISTS | [2010/27] | French: | RÉSINES PHOTOSENSIBLES EN COUCHE ÉPAISSE | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2008 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0939339 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2,9-11,16-20 * page 6; example 4 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1126321 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [A] 1,2,9-11,16-20 * page 7, paragraph 47 *; | [A]US2003219677 (NAMBA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,9-11,16-20 * page 8, paragraph 175 * * pages 8-9, paragraph 179 - paragraph 182 * * page 9, paragraph 196 ** page 10; example 1; table 1 *; | [A]EP1415968 (KYOWA YUKA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,9-11,16-20 * page 8, lines 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2005081062 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,9-11,16-20 * page 36, paragraph 77 *; | [Y]US2006251986 (SATO KAZUFUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,9-11,16-20 * page 7; example 1 *; | US2007281243 [ ] (HIRAYAMA TAKU [JP]) [ ] * page 15, paragraph 174 *; | [A] - M. TOUKHY ET AL., "Chemically amplified, thick film, i-line positive resist for electroplating and redistribution applications", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, USA, (200602), vol. 6153, no. 2, pages 61534H-1 - 61534H-8, XP002513378 [A] 1,2,9-11,16-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.656595 |