EP2212579 - METHOD FOR HILL START ASSISTANCE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE RINALDIS, Alessandro 48 rue Doudeauville F-75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
MALLET, Mickaël 7 rue du Grand Cerf F-78180 Montigny-le-bretonneux / FR | 03 /
POTHIN, Richard 10 bis rue de Coignières F-78760 Jouars-pontchartrain / FR | 04 /
LE VOURCH, Yves 27 rue de la Celle F-78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [2010/31] | Application number, filing date | 08833538.5 | 18.08.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008FR51503 | Priority number, date | FR20070057823 | 25.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757823 | [2010/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009040487 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2212579 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2212579 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/08 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
F16D48/08 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10412 (EP,US);
F16D2500/30425 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3065 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3067 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3161 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3165 (EP,US);
F16D2500/50287 (EP,US);
F16D2500/50841 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STARTHILFE FÜR ANFAHREN AN EINER STEIGUNG | [2010/31] | English: | METHOD FOR HILL START ASSISTANCE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE | [2010/31] | French: | PROCEDE D'ASSISTANCE AU DEMARRAGE EN COTE D'UN VEHICULE MOTORISE | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 17.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | CZ | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | HR | 13.07.2011 | HU | 13.07.2011 | IE | 13.07.2011 | IT | 13.07.2011 | LT | 13.07.2011 | LV | 13.07.2011 | MT | 13.07.2011 | NL | 13.07.2011 | PL | 13.07.2011 | RO | 13.07.2011 | SE | 13.07.2011 | SI | 13.07.2011 | SK | 13.07.2011 | TR | 13.07.2011 | LU | 18.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 13.10.2011 | NO | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | ES | 24.10.2011 | IS | 13.11.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 18.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
HR | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
MT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | MT | 13.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2324583 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 17 - line 35 * * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 22 * * page 10, line 29 - page 13, line 17 *; | [Y]DE10008822 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 20 - line 27 * * claims 1-18 *; | [A]FR2825434 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 34 * * figure 5 *; | [DY]DE10242122 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DY] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0032] *; | [A]EP1628032 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0022] , [0026] * |