EP2198772 - DIAGNOSIS SUPPORT DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIZUKA, Yoshio c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Masahiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
MIYASA, Kazuhiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
KATAYAMA, Akihiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Derham, Cassandra Virginie Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 08833710.0 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008JP67444 | Priority number, date | JP20070256014 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007256014 | [2010/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009041586 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2198772 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G06F17/21, G06F17/30, G06Q50/00 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/583 (EP,US);
G06F40/211 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/70 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H80/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINER DIAGNOSE UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/25] | English: | DIAGNOSIS SUPPORT DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2010/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT DE DIAGNOSTIC ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2010 | Translation filed | 28.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005065728 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2003033327 (FUJITSU LTD) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006147099 (MARSHALL JULIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0022] , [0025] , [0036] , [0040] *; | [A]US2007083396 (KANADA SHOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0013] , [0030] , [0034] , [0035] , [0037] , [0069] * | International search | [Y]JP2003033327 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH09223129 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2005065728 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JP2007140861 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC); | [A]JP2006059063 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2003033327 | JP2006155002 | JP2006181137 | - KAWADA, NIKI; OMATSU, "Curvature Based Internal Structure Analysis of Pulmonary Nodules Using Thoracic 3-D CT Images", THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE IEICE, D-II, (200001), vol. J83-D-II, no. 1, pages 209 - 218 | - J.J. KOENDERINK; A.J.V. DOORN, "Surface Shape and curvature scales", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, (1992), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/0262-8856(92)90076-F, pages 557 - 565, XP026655642 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0262-8856(92)90076-F | - C. DORAI; A.K. JAIN, "COSMOS - A Representation scheme for 3-D free-form objects", IEEE TRANS. PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1997), vol. PAMI-19, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/34.625113, pages 1115 - 1130, XP000726125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.625113 |