EP2199370 - PROCESSES FOR PRODUCTION OF SYNTHETIC NAPHTHA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Oil, Gas and Metals National Corporation 1310, Omiya-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 212-8554 / JP | For all designated states INPEX Corporation 5-3-1 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6332 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Oil Corporation 3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8412 / JP | For all designated states Japan Petroleum Exploration Co., Ltd. 7-12, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | For all designated states Cosmo Oil Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8528 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Steel Engineering Co., Ltd 5-1, Osaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8604 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Japan Oil, Gas and Metals National Corporation 1310, Omiya-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 212-8554 / JP | ||
For all designated states INPEX Corporation 5-3-1 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6332 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nippon Oil Corporation 3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8412 / JP | |||
For all designated states Japan Petroleum Exploration Co., Ltd. 7-12 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
For all designated states Cosmo Oil Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nippon Steel Engineering Co., Ltd 5-1, Osaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8604 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Yuichi c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8 Chidori-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08833841.3 | 25.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008JP67308 | Priority number, date | JP20070256547 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007256547 | JP20070256548 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007256548 | [2010/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009041508 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199370 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/02 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C10G45/02 (EP,US);
C10G2/30 (EP,US);
C10G35/04 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1022 (EP,US);
C10G2300/4081 (EP,US);
C10G2400/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SYNTHETISCHEM NAPHTHA | [2010/25] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PRODUCTION OF SYNTHETIC NAPHTHA | [2010/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE NAPHTE SYNTHÉTIQUE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | Translation filed | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0060029 (SASOL TECH PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, line 8 - line 9 * * page 3, line 33 - line 36 * * page 7, line 9 - line 12 *; | [Y]US2006144756 (ACKERSON MICHAEL D [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0002] , [0048] *; | [A]GB769346 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1-6 * page 1, lines 13-14,57-69 *; | [A]WO2004018390 (CATALYTIC DISTILLATION TECH [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 4 * * page 2, line 24 - line 31 * * page 3, lines 6-9,30 *; | [A]WO2007009987 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 4 *; | [Y]US2007209966 (ABHARI RAMIN [US]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * | International search | [A]JPH11509137 (EXXON RESEARCH & ENGINEERING CO.); | [A]JP2005514516 (CHEVRON USA INC.); | [A]WO2007034555 (JAPAN OIL GAS & METALS JOGMEC [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007527450 (CHEVRON USA INC.) | by applicant | JP2004323626 |