EP2203446 - CHROMENONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR LEUKOTRIENE BIOSYNTHESIS INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSSELIN, Francis 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
VYDRA, Vicky 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08833922.1 | 23.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US10987 | Priority number, date | US20070995525P | 27.09.2007 Original published format: US 995525 P | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009042098 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203446 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, A61K31/4245, A61P19/02 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | CHROMENONDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HEMMUNG VON LEUKOTRIEN-BIOSYNTHESE | [2010/27] | English: | CHROMENONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR LEUKOTRIENE BIOSYNTHESIS INHIBITION | [2010/27] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE CHROMÉNONE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR L'INHIBITION DE LA BIOSYNTHÈSE DES LEUCOTRIÈNES | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2006099735 (MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [XD] 1-20 * example 7; claims 1-18 *; | [Y]WO2004108720 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1-43 *; | [Y]US5424320 (FORTIN REJEAN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]WO2007038865 (MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1-23 * |