EP2185621 - CURABLE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR MOLDED BODIES, MOLDED BODY, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Junichi 1-18-703 Shinashiyashimo Suita-shi Osaka 565-0803 / JP | 02 /
TSUJINO, Yasunori 1-24 Saitoasagi 6-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Kunio 18-9 Minaminosaka 2-chome Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0136 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Ai c/o Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 5-8, Nishiotabicho Suita-shi Osaka 564-8512 / JP | 05 /
YAMASHITA, Masafumi 2-9-310 Sakaemachi 1-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0825 / JP | 06 /
KASANO, Yukihiro 9-10-105 Takashirocho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0024 / JP | 07 /
HIRAUCHI, Tatsushi 5-1-101 Nishimachi Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0854 / JP | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Junichi 1-18-703 Shinashiyashimo Suita-shi Osaka 565-0803 / JP | ||
02 /
TSUJINO, Yasunori 1-24 Saitoasagi 6-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0085 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAHASHI, Kunio 18-9 Minaminosaka 2-chome Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0136 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUMOTO, Ai 5-1-403 Nishimachi Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0854 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMASHITA, Masafumi 2-9-310 Sakaemachi 1-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0825 / JP | |||
06 /
KASANO, Yukihiro 9-10-105 Takashirocho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0024 / JP | |||
07 /
HIRAUCHI, Tatsushi 5-1-101 Nishimachi Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0854 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08834161.5 | 25.09.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008JP67875 | Priority number, date | JP20070252235 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007252235 | JP20080083628 | 27.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008083628 | JP20080083629 | 27.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008083629 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009041711 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185621 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/20, C08G77/04, G02B1/04 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GUSSELEMENTE, GUSSELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2010/20] | English: | CURABLE RESIN COMPOSITION FOR MOLDED BODIES, MOLDED BODY, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2010/20] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DURCISSABLE POUR CORPS MOULÉS, CORPS MOULÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 31.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05148410 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH05148411 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JP2003277474 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD, et al); | [X]JP2006335894 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK); | [X]JP2007016114 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK, et al); | [X]JP2007016115 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK, et al); | [XE]JP2008274260 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) | [Y] - Compounding Ingredients for Rubber and Plastics, POLYMER DIGEST C0. , LTD., (20031202), pages 290 - 317 |