EP2195508 - EXTERNALLY ACTIVATED SEAL SYSTEM FOR WELLHEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plexus Holdings, PLC. Plexus House Site 2, Burnside Drive Dyce Aberdeen AB21 0HW / GB | [2015/10] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Plexus Holdings, PLC. Plexus House 1 Cromwell Place London SW7 2JE / GB | ||
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Plexus Ocean Systems Limited Units 1 and 2 Ashley Base Pittmedden Road Dyce, Aberdeen AB21 0DP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANBILDERBEEK, Bernard, Herman 1224 North Post Oak Road, Suite 120 Houston, TX 77055 / US | [2018/09] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
VANBILDERBEEK, Bernard, Herman 1224 North Post Oak Road, Suite 120 Houston TX 77055 / US | Representative(s) | Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [2018/09] |
Former [2010/24] | Jackson, Nicholas Andrew Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08834237.3 | 23.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008US11020 | Priority number, date | US20070903715 | 24.09.2007 Original published format: US 903715 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009042121 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2195508 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195508 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/02, E21B23/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
E21B33/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2010/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTERN AKTIVIERTES DICHTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN BOHRLOCHKOPF | [2010/24] | English: | EXTERNALLY ACTIVATED SEAL SYSTEM FOR WELLHEAD | [2010/24] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ À ACTIVATION EXTERNE POUR TÊTE DE PUITS | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2008 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IE | 23.09.2018 | LU | 23.09.2018 | MT | 23.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
MT | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
MT | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.09.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4559809 (MAYO JOHN H [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 20 - line 46 * * figure 1B *; | [A]US6092596 (VAN BILDERBEEK BERNARD HERMAN [GB]) [A] 1,4,5* figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO0244520 (COOPER CAMERON CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 15, line 13 - line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1519002 (COOPER CAMERON CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0033] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2005211442 (MCGUIRE BOB [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0043] * * figure 6 *; | [X]US7128143 (VAN BILDERBEEK BERNARD HERMAN [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 10, line 30 - column 12, line 17 * * figure 4 * | International search | [A]US5360063 (HENDERSON JR HERMAN O [US]); | [A]US7111688 (VANBILDERBEEK BERNARD H [US]); | [X]US7128143 (VAN BILDERBEEK BERNARD HERMAN [US]); | [X]US2007034382 (VAN BILDERBEEK BERNARD H [US]) |