EP2195620 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE METERED DISPENSING OF A MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santo, Wilfried 10, Dornhaldenstrasse 79541 Lörrach-Hauingen / DE | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Weiss, Peter Dres. Weiss, Arat & Stern Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08834275.3 | 25.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008EP08179 | Priority number, date | DE20071045964 | 25.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007045964 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009040121 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2195620 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/02, B05B11/04, A61M35/00, B65D35/30, B65D83/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
G01F11/02 (EP,US);
B05B11/1015 (EP,US);
G01F11/025 (EP,US);
B05B11/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIERTEN AUSBRINGEN EINES MEDIUMS | [2010/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE METERED DISPENSING OF A MEDIUM | [2010/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION DOSÉE D'UN FLUIDE | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 21.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 15.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB997425 (ROMA IND PTY LTD) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,20,21,23 * page 2, line 15 - line 114; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE3522837 (BADEWIEN REINHARD) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,20-23 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 64 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 43; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9118798 (RESEAL INT LP [US]) [X] 1-3,6* page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 4 * | by applicant | GB997425 | DE3522837 | WO9118798 |