EP2192548 - REGISTRATION DEVICE, REGISTRATION METHOD, AUTHENTICATION DEVICE AND AUTHENTICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states mofiria Corporation C'est La Vie Gotanda Building,7F 2-13-6 Nishi-Gotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | [2014/09] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHAMMAD, Abdul Muquit c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Hiroshi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Merryweather, Colin Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08834407.2 | 24.09.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008JP67782 | Priority number, date | JP20070254982 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007254982 | [2010/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009041704 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2192548 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06K9/64 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
G06V40/10 (EP,US);
G06V10/75 (EP,US);
G06V40/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | REGISTRIERVORRICHTUNG, REGISTRIERVERFAHREN, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/22] | English: | REGISTRATION DEVICE, REGISTRATION METHOD, AUTHENTICATION DEVICE AND AUTHENTICATION METHOD | [2010/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT, DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2010 | Translation filed | 22.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6301375 (CHOI HWAN-SOO [KR]) [Y] 2* figures 2,5,6 *; | [XY]EP1804193 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0166] , [0161] - [0163]; figures 1,24b * [Y] 2 | International search | [X]JPH06274602 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2003030661 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2005215883 (SONY CORP) |