EP2199456 - POLYESTER FIBER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND TEXTILE STRUCTURE EMPLOYING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Takeo c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | 02 /
TABEYA, Toshihiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
SEKI, Masao c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | 04 /
TAKEDA, Keiji c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | [2019/03] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Takeo c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | ||
02 /
TABEYA, Toshihiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | |||
03 /
SEKI, Masao c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKEDA, Keiji c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2010/25] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08834437.9 | 25.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008JP67322 | Priority number, date | JP20070248766 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007248766 | [2010/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009041518 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199456 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199456 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/322, D06M101/32, D01F6/62, D06M13/352, D06M13/11, D06M13/432, C08K5/29, D01F11/06 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C08K5/29 (EP,US);
D01F11/06 (US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D01F6/625 (EP,US);
D06M13/11 (EP,US);
D06M13/352 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | D06M13/322, D06M101/32, D01F6/62, D06M13/352, D06M13/11, D06M13/432 | ||
Former IPC [2010/25] | D06M13/322, D06M101/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/03] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYESTERFASER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND TEXTILSTRUKTUR DAMIT | [2010/25] | English: | POLYESTER FIBER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND TEXTILE STRUCTURE EMPLOYING THE SAME | [2010/25] | French: | FIBRE POLYESTER, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET STRUCTURE TEXTILE L'UTILISANT | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2010 | Translation filed | 19.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 30.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2008 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | FI | 16.01.2019 | HR | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | NL | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | SE | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | NO | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | IE | 25.09.2019 | LU | 25.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.09.2008 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 16.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001261797 ; | [X]JP2002030208 ; | [X]EP1564316 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8,12-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 03, Database accession no. 2002-021172, XP002687549 & JP2001261797 A 20010926 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 36, Database accession no. 2002-322835, XP002687550 & JP2002030208 A 20020131 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS63152466 (GUNZE KK); | [Y]JPH09195182 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JPH1150379 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2000226766 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JP2001271250 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2004324008 (TOYO BOSEKI) | Examination | US3867181 | by applicant | JPH1180522 | JP2001261797 | JP2002030208 | JP2005226183 |