EP2193067 - QUICK RELEASE STEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lacreu, Alejandro 302 West 79th Street, Apt. 3A New York, NY 10024 / US | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2010/23] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08834966.7 | 08.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008US10461 | Priority number, date | US20070866544 | 03.10.2007 Original published format: US 866544 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009045260 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2193067 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62K21/16, B62K21/22 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
B62K21/16 (EP,US);
B62K21/22 (EP,US);
B62K2206/00 (EP);
Y10T74/2078 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20792 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/23] | B62K21/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | LENKERVORBAU MIT SCHNELLEM LÖSEMECHANIMUS | [2010/23] | English: | QUICK RELEASE STEM | [2010/23] | French: | TIGE A LIBERATION RAPIDE | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 26.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2014 | 30.09.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]DE202004016964U (ONIPAX COOPERATION SHETOU [TW]) [I] 1-4,9,10,15 * the whole document * [A] 5-8,11-14; | [ID]US5269550 (HON DAVID T [US], et al) [ID] 10,15 * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 66 * * column 9, line 16 - line 27 * * figures 1, 2, 11, 12 * | International search | [Y]US2006076752 (MONTAGUE DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]US5197349 (HERMAN WILLIAM P [US]) |