EP2200947 - MATERIAL WITH PHOTOCATALYTIC PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSON, Sophie 33 bis rue Lamarck 75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
VERMERSCH, François-Julien 26 avenue Reille F-75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
HUIGNARD, Arnaud 33 bis rue Lamarck F-75018 Paris / FR | [2010/32] |
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
BESSON, Sophie 33 bis rue Lamarck 75018 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
VERMERSCH, François-Julien 26 avenue Reille F-7501 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
HUIGNARD, Arnaud 33 bis rue Lamarck F-75018 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
BESSON, Sophie 9 bis rue du Hainaut F-75019 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
VERMERSCH, François-Julien 26 avenue Reille F-7501 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
HUIGNARD, Arnaud 33 bis rue Lamarck F-75018 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Teyssedre, Laurent Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08835279.4 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008FR51602 | Priority number, date | FR20070057467 | 10.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757467 | [2010/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009044066 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2200947 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/00, C03C4/12, C03C10/16, C03C17/23, C03C17/245, C03C17/34, C09K11/02, C09K11/77 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
C03C17/23 (EP,US);
C03C10/16 (EP,US);
C03C17/2456 (EP,US);
C03C17/3411 (EP,US);
C03C3/00 (EP,US);
C03C4/12 (EP,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
C09K11/7756 (EP,US);
C09K11/7769 (EP,US);
C09K11/7773 (EP,US);
C09K11/77744 (EP,US);
C03C2217/212 (EP,US);
C03C2217/44 (EP,US);
C03C2217/477 (EP,US);
C03C2217/71 (EP,US);
Y10T428/315 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | MATERIAL MIT PHOTOKATALYTISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2010/26] | English: | MATERIAL WITH PHOTOCATALYTIC PROPERTIES | [2010/26] | French: | MATERIAU A PROPRIETES PHOTOCATALYTIQUES | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 19.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0756021 (YAMAMURA GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [DA]FR2868770 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]); | [PX]WO2007131722 (SCHOTT AG [DE], et al) |