EP2176128 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING TRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Normandie Appats Société par actions simplifiée 19, rue du Colonel Fabien 14860 Ranville / FR | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPUSZANSKI, Michel 24, rue de la Lisière F-14123 Cormelles Le Royal / FR | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Benech, Frédéric Cabinet Benech 15, rue d'Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Benech, Frédéric Cabinet Frederic Benech 146-150, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08835493.1 | 18.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008FR01070 | Priority number, date | FR20070005190 | 18.07.2007 Original published format: FR 0705190 | [2010/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009043989 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2176128 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/36, B65B3/06, B65B25/00, B65B67/02 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
B65B25/00 (EP,US);
B65B1/36 (EP,US);
B65B3/06 (EP,US);
B65B67/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHALENFÜLLUNG | [2010/16] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING TRAYS | [2010/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE POUR BARQUETTES | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 24.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5651401 (CADOS DIMITRI [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 1, line 7 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0265128 (METAL BOX PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 18 * * column 3, line 44 - line 51 *; | [A]US3987824 (ZEHNDER FRED W) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 7,8 * * claim 1 * |