EP2209767 - PRODUCTION OF MONATIN ENANTIOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUDDOO, Subash 14 Pelikaan Street Randpark Ridge 2156 Randburg / ZA | 02 /
ROUSSEAU, Amanda, L. 9 Hathersage Close 13A Oxford Road 2047 Bedford Gardens / ZA | 03 /
GORDON, Gregory, E., R. 111 5th Avenue JHB 2092 Melville / ZA | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Elseviers, Myriam, et al Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Elseviers, Myriam, et al Cargill Europe bvba Law-IP Department Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | ||
Former [2010/30] | De Corte, Filip Alois Julia, et al Cargill Europe bvba Law-IP Department Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 08836024.3 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008IB02522 | Priority number, date | US20070865441 | 01.10.2007 Original published format: US 865441 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009044245 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2209767 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/18 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
C07D209/20 (EP,US);
C07D209/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | C07D209/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON MONATIN-ENANTIOMEREN | [2010/30] | English: | PRODUCTION OF MONATIN ENANTIOMERS | [2010/30] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ÉNANTIOMÈRES DE MONATINE | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 11.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - YOSHIHIKO ITO ET AL, "An one-pot synthesis of 3-alkylindoles from o-tolyl isocyanides.", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19790101), no. 10, doi:10.1246/cl.1979.1273, ISSN 0366-7022, pages 1273 - 1276, XP055100035 [X] 1 * Scheme; see in particular conversion (3) to (5); page 1273 * * page 1274; example 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.1979.1273 | International search | [Y]US5128482 (OLIVIER JOHAN [ZA], et al); | [Y]US5545644 (MACOR JOHN E [US], et al); | [Y]US5703270 (NAKAGAWA KOICHI [JP], et al) |