EP2203565 - MUTATED ACETOHYDROXYACID SYNTHASE GENES IN BRASSICA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cibus Europe B.V. Goessestraatweg 19 4421 Ad Kapelle / NL | [2015/34] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Cibus Europe B.V. Goessestraatweg 19 4421 Ad Kapelle / NL | ||
For all designated states Incima IPCO B.V. Pos Cabai Office Park Unit 13 P.O. Box 403 Curaçao / AN | |||
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states Cibus International, L.P. Nemours Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | ||
For all designated states INCIMA BV Pos Cabai Office Park Unit 13 PO Box 403 Curacoa / AN | |||
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Cibus International LP, LTD Nemours Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | ||
For all designated states INCIMA BV Pos Cabai Office Park Unit 13 PO Box 403 Curacoa / AN | |||
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Cibus International LP, LTD Nemours Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOPKE, Christian 13036 Deer Park Way San Diego California 92130 / US | 02 /
GOCAL, Greg F. W. 13737 Bassmore Drive San Diego California 92129 / US | 03 /
WALKER, Keith 13315 Roxton Circle San Diego California 92130 / US | 04 /
BEETHAM, Peter R. 7128 Tanager Drive Carlsbad California 92009 / US | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2010/27] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08836084.7 | 03.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US78798 | Priority number, date | US20070977944P | 05.10.2007 Original published format: US 977944 P | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009046334 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203565 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203565 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/88, C12N15/82 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/8274 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (EA);
C07K14/415 (EA);
C12N15/09 (EA);
C12N9/1022 (US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/27] | C12Q1/68, C12N5/04, A01H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2010/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 05.05.2010 | BA | 05.05.2010 | MK | 05.05.2010 | RS | 05.05.2010 | Title | German: | MUTIERTE ACETOHYDROXYSÄURE-SYNTHASE-GENE IN BRASSICA | [2010/27] | English: | MUTATED ACETOHYDROXYACID SYNTHASE GENES IN BRASSICA | [2010/27] | French: | GÈNES D'ACÉTOHYDROXYACIDE SYNTHASE MUTÉS CHEZ BRASSICA | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 28.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.04.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13175389.9 / EP2700721 | EP13175393.1 / EP2700722 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2008 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MT | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | IE | 03.10.2015 | LU | 03.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.10.2015 | ||
LU | 03.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.10.2015 | ||
LU | 03.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 03.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 03.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 03.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 03.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | NO | 26.11.2015 | |
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | NO | 26.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0185970 (UNIV LOUISIANA STATE [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-14,16-21,23-30,32-49 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003097692 (JANDER GEORG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11-13,16-20,23-29,32-34,36-49 * claims 1-4; sequence 4 *; | [A]WO2005020673 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-14,16-21,23-30,32-49 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006024351 (BASF AGROCHEMICAL PRODUCTS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-14,16-21,23-30,32-49* the whole document *; | [A]WO2006060634 (BASF AGROCHEMICAL PRODUCTS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-14,16-21,23-30,32-49 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007005581 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-14,16-21,23-30,32-49 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2008071715 (BASF AGROCHEMICAL PRODUCTS BV [NL], et al) [XP] 1,2,5-7,9,11-13,16-20,23-29,32-34,36-49 * claims 32-34 *; | [E]WO2008124495 (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-3,5-7,9,11-14,16-21,23-30,32-49 * claim 1r *; | [X] - JOSE MARIA BRUNIARD, "Inheritance of imidazolinone resistance, characterization of cross-resistance pattern, and identification of molecular markers in sunflower (Helianthus annuus L.)", DISSERTATION,, (20010901), page 89PP, XP009138420 [X] 1,2,5-7 * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 19; table 20 * | [X] - KOLKMAN J M ET AL, "Acetohydroxyacid synthase mutations conferring resistance to imidazolinone or sulfonylurea herbicides in sunflower", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00122-004-1716-7, (20041001), vol. 109, no. 6, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 1147 - 1159, XP002417954 [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11-13,16-20,23-29,32-49 * page 1157, line 8 - page 1158, column 2, line 7 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-004-1716-7 | [X] - WHITE A D ET AL, "ISOLATION OF ACETOLACTATET SYNTHASE HOMOLOGS IN COMMON SUNFLOWERS", WEED SCIENCE, WEED SCIENCE SOCIETY OF AMERICA, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (20031101), vol. 51, no. 6, ISSN 0043-1745, pages 845 - 853, XP009058786 [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11-13,16-20,23-29,32-34,36-49 * Introduction * * table 4 * | International search | [A]US5795972 (KMIEC ERIC B [US]); | [A]US6576455 (KAKEFUDA GENICHI [US], et al); | [Y]US6870075 (BEETHAM PETER R [US], et al); | [X]US2007118920 (LEON ALBERTO JAVIER [AR], et al) | by applicant | US4545060 | US5334711 | EP0629387 | EP0679657 | US5565350 | US5731181 | US5756325 | US5760012 | US5780296 | US5795972 | WO9849350 | US5871984 | WO9907865 | US5888983 | WO9940789 | US5945339 | WO9958723 | WO9958702 | US6004804 | US6010907 | US6271360 | US6479292 | US2003097692 | US7060500 | US7094606 | US2007118920 | WO2008071715 | WO2008124495 | - JUDITH KOLKMAN ET AL., "Acetohydroxyacid synthase mutations conferring resistance to imidazolinone or sulfonylurea herbicides in sunflower", THEOR. APPL. GENET, (2004), vol. 109, pages 1147 - 1159 | - ANTHONY WHITE ET AL., "Isolation of acetolactate synthase homologs in common sunflower", WEED SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 51, pages 845 - 853 | WO2000US23457 |