EP2207216 - CHALCOGENIDE FILM AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/28] | CHALCOGENIDE FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2014/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulvac, Inc. 2500, Hagisono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUCHI, Shin c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | 02 /
NISHIOKA, Yutaka c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, Isao c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | 04 /
JIMBO, Takehito c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | 05 /
SUU, Koukou c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | [2014/28] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
KIKUCHI, Shin c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIOKA, Yutaka c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | |||
03 /
KIMURA, Isao c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | |||
04 /
JIMBO, Takehito c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | |||
05 /
SUU, Koukou c/o ULVAC Inc. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2014/28] |
Former [2010/28] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08836407.0 | 01.10.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008JP67823 | Priority number, date | JP20070258563 | 02.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007258563 | [2010/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009044769 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2207216 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2207216 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L45/00 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H10N70/882 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/231 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/0004 (KR);
H10N70/026 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/066 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/28] | H01L45/00, H01L27/105 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | CHALKOGENIDFILM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2010/28] | English: | CHALCOGENIDE FILM AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2014/11] | French: | FILM DE CHALCOGÉNURE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/28] | CHALCOGENIDE FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2010 | Translation filed | 03.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2008 | AT | 09.07.2014 | BE | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | CZ | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | ES | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | HR | 09.07.2014 | IT | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | MT | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | PL | 09.07.2014 | RO | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SI | 09.07.2014 | SK | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | IE | 01.10.2014 | LU | 01.10.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | GB | 09.10.2014 | NO | 09.10.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | IS | 09.11.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.10.2008 | |
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
TR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004241535 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]US2006113520 (YAMAMOTO NAOKI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH11510317 ; | [A]JP2006202823 (RENESAS TECH CORP); | [Y]JP2007019475 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007165710 (ELPIDA MEMORY INC); | [XP]JP2008182234 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2004348906 | JP2007258563 |