EP2195384 - AROMATIC POLYESTER POLYOLS AND AROMATIC POLYESTER POLYOL BLENDS CONTAINING BIORENEWABLE COMPONENTS AND METHODS OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEPAN COMPANY 22 West Frontage Road Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | [2020/09] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states STEPAN COMPANY 22 West Frontage Road Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Timothy, L. 678 Providence Lane Lindenhurst IL 60046 / US | 02 /
HICKEY, Leo, F. 215 S. Chestnut Avenue Arlington Heights IL 60005 / US | 03 /
YAO, Chunhua 965 Knollwood Drive Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
LAMBERT, Timothy, L. 678 Providence Lane Lindenhurst IL 60046 / US | ||
02 /
HICKEY, Leo, F. 215 S. Chestnut Avenue Arlington Heights IL 60005 / US | |||
03 /
YAO, Chunhua 1629 Hunter Drive Apt.3D Wheeling IL 60090 / US | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2010/24] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08836595.2 | 26.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008US77993 | Priority number, date | US20070976182P | 28.09.2007 Original published format: US 976182 P | US20080085342 | 31.07.2008 Original published format: US 85342 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009045926 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2195384 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195384 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/06, C08G18/36, C08G18/66, C08G101/00, C08G63/20, C08G63/668, C08G63/91, C08J9/14, C08G18/42 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
C08G18/36 (EP,US);
C08G18/06 (US);
C08G18/4288 (EP,US);
C08G18/6662 (EP,US);
C08G63/20 (EP,US);
C08G63/668 (EP,US);
C08G63/916 (EP,US);
C08J9/141 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | C08L63/00, C08G18/42, C08J9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/24] | C08L63/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2010/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE POLYESTERPOLYOLE UND AROMATISCHE POLYESTERPOLYOLMISCHUNGEN MIT NACHWACHSENDEN BESTANDTEILEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/24] | English: | AROMATIC POLYESTER POLYOLS AND AROMATIC POLYESTER POLYOL BLENDS CONTAINING BIORENEWABLE COMPONENTS AND METHODS OF MAKING | [2010/24] | French: | POLYOLS AROMATIQUES DE POLYESTER ET MÉLANGES DE POLYOLS AROMATIQUES DE POLYESTER CONTENANT DES COMPOSANTS BIORENOUVELABLES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 03.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2008 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 26.09.2020 | LU | 26.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 26.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 26.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0256355 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-12,15,16 * page 6, lines 9-21, 24-34; examples 1-3; table 1 * * claims 2,3 * [Y] 1-17; | [Y]WO0061654 (STEPAN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0104225 (POLYMERMANN ASIA PVT LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1,4,6-9,15,16 * examples V-VII; claims 1-5,17 * [Y] 1-17; | [Y]WO2005085310 (RATHOR AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y] - PROCIAK A, "Properties of polyurethane foams modified with natural oil-based polyols", CELLULAR POLYMERS, RAPRA TECHNOLOGY LTD. SHAWBURY, SHREWSBURY, GB, (20070101), vol. 26, no. 6, ISSN 0262-4893, pages 381 - 392, XP001510444 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5922779 (HICKEY F LEO [US]); | [Y]US2004192859 (PARKER HARRY W [US], et al) | by applicant | US4529744 | US5922779 | US6107433 | US6359022 | US6433121 | US6573354 | US6686435 | - Polyethers, Part I: Polyalkylene Oxides and Other Polyethers, Interscience, (19630000), pages 233 - 7 |