EP2207236 - SECONDARY CELL CHARGE CONTROL METHOD AND CHARGE CONTROL CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Naohisa c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Toshihiro c/o Panasonic Corporation I.P.R.O.C IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08836779.2 | 03.10.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008JP02786 | Priority number, date | JP20070261753 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007261753 | [2010/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009044557 | Date: | 09.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2207236 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H02J7/02, H02J7/04, H01M10/46, H02J7/00, B60L3/00, B60L3/12, B60L8/00, B60L11/18 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (US);
B60L3/12 (EP,US);
B60L58/13 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60L8/003 (EP,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,US);
H02J7/007194 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | H01M10/44, H02J7/02, H02J7/04, H01M10/46, H02J7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/28] | H01M10/44, H02J7/02, H02J7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | LADESTEUERVERFAHREN UND LADESTEUERSCHALTUNG FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRZELLE | [2010/28] | English: | SECONDARY CELL CHARGE CONTROL METHOD AND CHARGE CONTROL CIRCUIT | [2010/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE DE CELLULE SECONDAIRE | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2010 | Translation filed | 13.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 19.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5736834 (KUNO HIROMICHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * figure 2 * * page 2, lines 4-17,43-57 * * abstract *; | [X]US6281663 (YAGI KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8,10 * column 4, lines 10-35 ** column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 13 *; | [X]US6707272 (THANDIWE IILONGA [US]) [X] 1,4-8,11-14 * column 4, lines 47-67 - column 5, lines 53-59 *; | [X]US2005134231 (CHO KYU-WOONG [KR]) [X] 1,5,6,8,12,13 * figures 1, 3A, 3B * * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] - [0040] * | International search | [X]JPH10290534 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]JP2006092850 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2006340527 (NISSAN MOTOR) |